EP2221876 - Absorber layer for thin film photovoltaic cells and a solar cell made therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2010/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramasesha, Sheela Kollali 151, 5th Cross Road NGEF Layout Sanjaya Nagar Bangalore, 560094 Karnataka / IN | 02 /
Kumar, Sundeep Flat No. B 306 Ittinia Anu Apartments Opposite Ujjawal Vidhalaya Whitefield Main Road Whitefield Bangalore 560066 Karnataka / IN | 03 /
Nayak, Mohandas No. 71, Krupa Nilaya 5th Cross, 7th Main Tata Nagar Kodigehalli Bangalore 560092 Karnataka / IN | 04 /
Saha, Atanu Pooja Residency Flat 003, 11th Main, 9th Cross HAL 2nd Stage Indiranagar Bangalore 560008 Karnataka / IN | 05 /
Aiyer, Hermantkumar Narshinham No. 36, Anugraha 3rd Cross, Marenahalli J.P. Nagar 2nd Phase Bangalore 560078 Karnataka / IN | [2010/34] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operations Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09250481.0 | 24.02.2009 | [2010/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2221876 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/032, H01L31/18 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
H01L31/0322 (EP);
H01L21/02425 (EP);
H01L21/02568 (EP);
H01L21/02614 (EP);
Y02E10/541 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [2011/18] |
Former [2010/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Absorptionsschicht für Dünnschicht photovoltaische Zellen und daraus hergestellte Solarzelle | [2010/34] | English: | Absorber layer for thin film photovoltaic cells and a solar cell made therefrom | [2010/34] | French: | Couche absorbante pour cellules photovoltaïques à film mince et cellule solaire fabriquée à partir de celle-ci | [2010/34] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 26.02.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 27.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0838864 (SHOWA SHELL SEKIYU [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6,9-12,14,15 * column 6, line 2 - column 7, line 34; figures 1,2; claims 1,5 *; | [X]WO2005089330 (BASOL BULENT M [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8,10,11,15 * paragraphs [0046] - [0048] - [0051] , [0063] , [0064] , [0066] , [0067] , [0080] , [0081]; figures 6,7,11 *; | [XA]WO2008121997 (LEIDHOLM CRAIG [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,10-12,14,15 * page 6, line 26 - page 8, line 28; figure 1; claims 1-20 * [A] 9; | [A]WO2006101986 (NANOSOLAR INC [US], et al) [A] 1,3-6,9-12,14,15 * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 12; figures 2,3 * * page 15, line 32 - page 16, line 32 * * page 18, lines 18-27 * * page 23, line 18 - page 24, line 23 * * page 25, line 14 - page 26, line 23 *; | [E]US2009139573 (RAMASESHA SHEELA KOLLALI [IN], et al) [E] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008121277 (ROBINSON MATTHEW R [US], et al) [A] 1-4,6,8-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0033] - [0041] , [0081] , [0082] , [0090] , [0094] , [0099] , [0101] , [0128] , [0129] , [0201] , [0202]; figures 1,5,13,15,17-19 * | [X] - BASOL B M ET AL, "CUINSE2 THIN FILMS AND HIGH-EFFICIENCY SOLAR CELLS OBTAINED BY SELENIZATION OF METALLIC LAYERS", RECORD OF THE PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE. KISSIMIMEE, MAY 21 19900521 NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19900521), vol. 1, pages 546 - 549, XP000480326 [X] 1,3,4,8,10,11 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0838864 | WO2005089330 | WO2008121997 | - B.M. BASROL, VIJAY K. KAPUR, RECORD OF THE 21 ST PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE, (19900521), vol. 1, pages 546 - 549 |