EP2157611 - Organic light emitting display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 17113, 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/40] |
Former [2012/40] | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | ||
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No.24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-city, Gyunggi-do 446-711 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Yong-Tak c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No. 24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-Do 446-711 / KR | 02 /
Lee, Jong-Hyuk c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No. 24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-Do 446-711 / KR | 03 /
Kim, Won-Jong c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No. 24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-Do 446-711 / KR | 04 /
Lee, Joon-Gu c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No. 24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-Do 446-711 / KR | 05 /
Choi, Jin-Baek c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No. 24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-Do 446-711 / KR | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09252031.1 | 20.08.2009 | [2010/08] | Priority number, date | KR20080081363 | 20.08.2008 Original published format: KR 20080081363 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2157611 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2157611 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32, H01L51/52 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
H10K59/80524 (EP,KR);
H10K59/131 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/828 (US);
H10K2102/3026 (EP,KR,US);
H10K2102/3031 (EP,US);
H10K2102/351 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Organische lichtemittierende Anzeigevorrichtung | [2010/08] | English: | Organic light emitting display | [2010/08] | French: | Panneau d'affichage électroluminescent organique | [2010/08] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 24.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/35] | 16.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6215245 (MORI MASAMI [JP]) [A] 1,13* column 1, line 65 - column 6, line 9; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2002187367 (SAKAGUCHI YOSHIKAZU [JP]) [Y] 1,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017] *; | [A]US2005088082 (MORITA HARUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,13 * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0104]; figure 1 *; | [I]US2007267973 (SUH MIN CHUL [KR]) [I] 1,13 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031]; figure 2 *; | [Y] - UCHIDA T ET AL, "Cesium-incorporated indium-tin-oxide films for use as a cathode with low work function for a transparent organic light-emitting device", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 496, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.TSF.2005.08.207, ISSN 0040-6090, (20060201), pages 75 - 80, (20060201), XP025006731 [Y] 1,13 * abstract * * page 75 - page 76; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tsf.2005.08.207 |