EP2186844 - Heat-curable resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2016/31] |
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1 Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiobara, Toshio, @ Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kashiwagi, Tsutomu, @ Silicone Denshi Zairyo G.K. Shin-Etsu Chemical Co.,Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi,Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Taguchi, Yusuke, @ Silicone Denshi Zairyo G.K. Shin-Etsu Chemical Co.,Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi,Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | [2016/31] |
Former [2010/20] | 01 /
Shiobara, Toshio, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Kashiwagi, Tsutomu, Silicone Denshi Zairyo G.K. Shin-Etsu Chemical Co.,Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi,Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Taguchi, Yusuke, Silicone Denshi Zairyo G.K. Shin-Etsu Chemical Co.,Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi,Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/31] |
Former [2010/20] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09252607.8 | 13.11.2009 | [2010/20] | Priority number, date | JP20080292759 | 14.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008292759 | [2010/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2186844 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2186844 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/30, C08G59/32, C08G59/42 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
C08G59/306 (EP,US);
C08G59/3245 (EP,US);
C08G59/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] |
Former [2010/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Wärmehärtbare Harzzusammensetzung | [2010/20] | English: | Heat-curable resin composition | [2010/20] | French: | Composition de résine thermodurcissable | [2010/20] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2010 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 03.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2009 | AT | 03.08.2016 | BE | 03.08.2016 | CY | 03.08.2016 | CZ | 03.08.2016 | DK | 03.08.2016 | EE | 03.08.2016 | ES | 03.08.2016 | FI | 03.08.2016 | HR | 03.08.2016 | IT | 03.08.2016 | LT | 03.08.2016 | LV | 03.08.2016 | MC | 03.08.2016 | MK | 03.08.2016 | NL | 03.08.2016 | PL | 03.08.2016 | RO | 03.08.2016 | SE | 03.08.2016 | SI | 03.08.2016 | SK | 03.08.2016 | SM | 03.08.2016 | TR | 03.08.2016 | BG | 03.11.2016 | NO | 03.11.2016 | GR | 04.11.2016 | GB | 13.11.2016 | IE | 13.11.2016 | MT | 13.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | FR | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | IS | 03.12.2016 | PT | 05.12.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 13.11.2009 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
TR | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
GB | 13.11.2016 | ||
IE | 13.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 13.11.2009 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
GB | 13.11.2016 | ||
IE | 13.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
GB | 13.11.2016 | ||
IE | 13.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IE | 13.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 03.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007299162 (HAITKO DEBORAH ANN [US]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0064]; claims 1-21 *; | [Y]DE19732500 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * page 2, line 30 - page 4, line 52; example 1; claims 1-8; table 2 *; | [Y]US2005282975 (HAITKO DEBORAH A [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0031]; claims 1-20 *; | [A]US2006204760 (ITO HISATAKA [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0046]; claims 1-5 * |