EP2327318 - An electrically heated smoking system with internal or external heater [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zuber, Gerard Rue du Centre 12 1752 Villars-sur-Glane / CH | 02 /
Greim, Olivier Chemin des Sources 1423 Villars-Burquin / CH | 03 /
Plojoux, Julien Rue Micheli-du-Crest 1205 Geneva / CH | 04 /
Ruscio, Dani Route de Troub 29 2088 Cressier / CH | [2011/22] | Representative(s) | Bradford, Victoria Sophie Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | Bradford, Victoria Sophie Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09252687.0 | 27.11.2009 | [2011/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2327318 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00 | [2011/22] | CPC: |
A24F40/46 (EP,KR,US);
A24D1/20 (KR);
A24B15/16 (KR);
A24D1/02 (KR);
A24D1/045 (KR);
A24F40/50 (KR);
A24F40/51 (KR);
A24F40/57 (KR);
A24F40/10 (EP,US);
A24F40/20 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrisch erhitztes Rauchsystem mit interner oder externer Heizvorrichtung | [2011/22] | English: | An electrically heated smoking system with internal or external heater | [2011/22] | French: | Système de fumage chauffé électriquement doté d'un chauffage interne ou externe | [2011/22] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 10.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0438862 (PHILIP MORRIS [US]); | [A]WO9527411 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [US]); | [XI]US5915387 (BAGGETT JR JAMES D [US], et al); | [X]DE19854009 (REEMTSMA H F & PH [DE]); | [A]WO2007042941 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]); | [XI]EP2113178 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) | by applicant | EP0358002 | EP20090252501 |