|
03.03.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.03.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
28.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
27.08.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
34 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
10.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
06.02.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.07.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.03.2009 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
21 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |