EP2247297 - THERAPEUTIC TREATMENT FOR LUNG CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vanderbilt University 1207 17th Avenue South, Suite 105 Nashville, TN 37212 / US | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUMMAR, Marshall, L. 513 Bel Air Place Brentwood TN 37027 / US | 02 /
BARR, Frederick, E. 2507 Natchez Trace Nashville TN 37212 / US | 03 /
FIKE, Candice, D. 1125 Mrb IV Vanderbilt University Medical Center Nashville TN 37232-0656 / US | 04 /
ASCHNER, Judy, L. 654 Lysander Court Brentwood TN 37027 / US | [2019/02] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
SUMMAR, Marshall, L. 513 Bel Air Place Brentwood TN 37027 / US | ||
02 /
BARR, Frederick, E. 2507 Natchez Trace Nashville TN 37212 / US | |||
03 /
FIKE, Candice, D. 1125 Mrb IV Vanderbilt University Medical Center Nashville TN 37232-0656 / US | |||
04 /
ASCHNER, Judy, L. 654 Lysander Court Brentwood TN 37027 / US | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/02] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/45] | Behnisch, Werner Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09707788.7 | 02.02.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009US32824 | Priority number, date | US20080025157 | 31.01.2008 Original published format: US 25157 | [2010/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009099998 | Date: | 13.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2247297 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2247297 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/198, A61K38/00, A61P11/00, A61P9/12 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/198 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (KR);
A61K9/08 (KR);
A61K9/10 (KR);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/21] | A61K38/00, A61P11/00, A61P9/12 | ||
Former IPC [2010/45] | A61K38/00, A61P11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/02] |
Former [2010/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 05.08.2010 | BA | 05.08.2010 | RS | 05.08.2010 | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE BEHANDLUNG VON LUNGENERKRANKUNGEN | [2010/45] | English: | THERAPEUTIC TREATMENT FOR LUNG CONDITIONS | [2010/45] | French: | TRAITEMENT THÉRAPEUTIQUE DE CONDITIONS PULMONAIRES | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 28.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.06.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.01.2019 | EE | 09.01.2019 | HR | 09.01.2019 | LT | 09.01.2019 | LV | 09.01.2019 | MC | 09.01.2019 | MK | 09.01.2019 | RO | 09.01.2019 | SI | 09.01.2019 | SK | 09.01.2019 | MT | 02.02.2019 | BG | 09.04.2019 | IS | 09.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 09.01.2019 | |
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 02.02.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | EE | 09.01.2019 | |
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 02.02.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | EE | 09.01.2019 | |
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | EE | 09.01.2019 | |
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HR | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HR | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | LT | 09.01.2019 | |
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | LT | 09.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - NELIN LEIF D ET AL, "L-arginine, but not D-arginine, increases nitric oxide production and vasodilates hypoxic neonatal pig lungs", FASEB JOURNAL, & FASEB MEETING ON EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY: TRANSLATING THE GENOME; WASHINGTON, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, USA; APRIL 17-21, 2004, (2004), vol. 18, no. 4-5, ISSN 0892-6638, page A327, XP009147240 [X] 1-10 * abstract * [Y] 1-10 | [XY] - FIKE CANDICE D ET AL, "L-arginine increases nitric oxide production in isolated lungs of chronically hypoxic newborn pigs", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSIOLOGY, (200005), vol. 88, no. 5, ISSN 8750-7587, pages 1797 - 1803, XP002633028 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 2 * [Y] 1-10 | [XY] - MITANI YOSHIHIDE ET AL, "PROLONGED ADMINISTRATION OF L-ARGININE AMELIORATES CHRONIC PULMONARY HYPERTENSION AND PULMONARY VASCULAR REMODELING IN RATS", CIRCULATION, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US, (19970715), vol. 96, no. 2, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 689 - 697, XP009083116 [X] 1-10 * figures 2,4,5 * * page 689, column 2 * [Y] 1-10 | [XY] - FAGAN JULIE M ET AL, "L-arginine reduces right heart hypertrophy in hypoxia-induced pulmonary hypertension", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (19990108), vol. 254, no. 1, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 100 - 103, XP002633029 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * table 3 * [Y] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1998.9887 | [XY] - MCCAFFREY MARTIN J ET AL, "Effect of L-arginine infusion on infants with persistent pulmonary hypertension of the newborn", BIOLOGY OF THE NEONATE, (1995), vol. 67, no. 4, ISSN 0006-3126, pages 240 - 243, XP009147215 [X] 1-10 * abstract * [Y] 1-10 | [XY] - ASCHNER JUDY L, "New therapies for pulmonary hypertension in neonates and children.", PEDIATRIC PULMONOLOGY. SUPPLEMENT 2004 LNKD- PUBMED:15029628, (2004), vol. 26, ISSN 1054-187X, pages 132 - 135, XP002633030 [X] 1-13 * page 132, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 133, column 1, paragraph l - column 2, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ppul.70082 | [XY] - SMITH ET AL, "Nitric oxide precursors and congenital heart surgery: A randomized controlled trial of oral citrulline", JOURNAL OF THORACIC AND CARDIOVASCULAR SURGERY, MOSBY-YEAR BOOK, INC., ST. LOUIS, MO, US, (20060701), vol. 132, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JTCVS.2006.02.012, ISSN 0022-5223, pages 58 - 65, XP005693517 [X] 11-13 * abstract * * page 64, column 2, paragraph l * [Y] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jtcvs.2006.02.012 | [XY] - ROMERO M J ET AL, "Therapeutic use of citrulline in cardiovascular disease", CARDIOVASCULAR DRUG REVIEWS 200609 GB LNKD- DOI:10.1111/J.1527-3466.2006.00275.X, (200609), vol. 24, no. 3-4, ISSN 0897-5957, pages 275 - 290, XP002633031 [X] 11-13 * abstract * * page 283, paragraph l - page 284, paragraph l * * page 286, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1527-3466.2006.00275.x | [T] - "Persistierende fetale Zirkulation (PFC-Syndrom)", Ania Carolina Muntau, Intensivkurs Pädiatrie, München, Elsevier Urban & Fischer, (2009), pages 17 - 18, ISBN 978-3-437-43392-4, XP002633032 [T] * page 18, paragraph 1 * | [A] - KINSELLA J P ET AL, "Bronchopulmonary dysplasia", LANCET THE, LANCET LIMITED. LONDON, GB, vol. 367, no. 9520, doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(06)68615-7, ISSN 0140-6736, (20060429), pages 1421 - 1431, (20060429), XP025094032 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(06)68615-7 | [T] - ANANTHAKRISHNAN MADHUMITA ET AL, "L-Citrulline ameliorates chronic hypoxia-induced pulmonary hypertension in newborn piglets", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY - LUNG CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR PHYSIOLOGY, (200909), vol. 297, no. 3, ISSN 1040-0605, pages L506 - L511, XP002633033 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajplung.00017.2009 | International search | [Y]US2004235953 (SUMMAR MARSHALL L [US], et al); | [A]US2007026448 (RAMANATHAN CHANDRA S [US], et al) | [Y] - SCHREIBER ET AL., "Inhaled nitric oxide in premature infants with the respiratory distress syndrome.", N ENGL. J. MED., (2003), vol. 349, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa031154, pages 2099 - 2107, XP002744286 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa031154 | [Y] - BERKENBOSCH ET AL., "Decreased synthesis and vasodilation to nitric oxide in piglets with hypoxia induced pulmonary hypertension.", AM. J. PHYSIOL. JUNG CELL. MOL. PHYSIOL., (2000), vol. 278, pages L276 - L283 | Examination | - ESCOBEDO M B ET AL, "A baboon model of bronchopulmonary dysplasia - I. Clinical features", EXPERIMENTAL AND MOLECULAR PATHOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, vol. 37, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0014-4800(82)90045-4, ISSN 0014-4800, (19821201), pages 323 - 334, (19821201), XP022973006 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-4800(82)90045-4 | - ROBERTA A. BALLARD ET AL, "Inhaled Nitric Oxide in Preterm Infants Undergoing Mechanical Ventilation", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (20060727), vol. 355, no. 4, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa061088, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 343 - 353, XP055212287 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa061088 | - ARUL VADIVEL ET AL, "L-Citrulline Attenuates Arrested Alveolar Growth and Pulmonary Hypertension in Oxygen-Induced Lung Injury in Newborn Rats", PEDIATRIC RESEARCH, US, (20101201), vol. 68, no. 6, doi:10.1203/PDR.0b013e3181f90278, ISSN 0031-3998, pages 519 - 525, XP055473629 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1203/PDR.0b013e3181f90278 | by applicant | US2004235953 | WO2005082042 | US6343382 | US6743823 | - JOBE et al., Am J Respir Crit Care Med, (20010000), vol. 163, pages 1723 - 1729 | - BALLARD et al., N Engl J Med, (20060000), vol. 355, pages 343 - 353 | - SHIMODA L et al., Physiol Res, (20000000), vol. 49, pages 549 - 560 | - SUBHEDAR, N. V., Acta Paediatr, (20040000), vol. 444, pages 29 - 32 | - NELIN et al., FASEB Journal, (20040000), vol. 18, no. 4-5, page A327 | - FIKE et al., Journal of Applied Physiology, (20000000), vol. 88, no. 5, pages 1797 - 1803 | - MITANI et al., Circulation, (19970000), vol. 96, no. 2, pages 689 - 697 | - FAGAN et al., Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, (19990000), vol. 254, no. 1, pages 100 - 103 | - MCCAFFREY et al., Biology of the Neonate, (19950000), vol. 67, no. 4, pages 240 - 243 | - SMITH et al., Journal of Thoracic and Cardiovascular Surgery, (20060000), vol. 132, no. 1, pages 58 - 65 | - ROMERO et al., Cardiovascular Drug Reviews, (20060000), vol. 24, no. 3-4, pages 275 - 290 | - BALLARD et al., New England Journal of Medicine, (20060000), vol. 355, no. 4, pages 343 - 353 | - RYAN, R. M., J Perinatology, (20060000), vol. 26, pages 207 - 209 | - ABMAN, S. H., Arch Dis Child Fetal Neonatal Ed, (20020000), vol. 87, pages F15 - F18 | - ALLEN, J., Am J Respir Crit Care Med, (20030000), vol. 168, pages 356 - 396 | - MUPANEMUNDA, R. H., Early Human Development, (19970000), vol. 47, pages 247 - 262 | - FIKE, C. D. et al., J Appl Physiol, (20000000), vol. 88, pages 1797 - 1803 | - FIKE, C. D. et al., American Journal of Physiology (Lung, Cellular and Molecular Physiology, (19980000), vol. 18, no. 274, pages L517 - L526 | - FIKE, C. D. et al., JAppl Physiol, (20000000), vol. 88, pages 1797 - 1803 | - TURLEY, J. E. et al., Am J Physiol Lung Cell Mol Physiol, (20030000), vol. 284, pages L489 - L500 | - FIKE, C. D. et al., American Journal of Physiology (Lung, Cellular and Molecular Physiology 18, (19980000), vol. 274, pages L517 - L526 | - MEIER, U., Pharm Stat, (20060000), vol. 5, pages 253 - 263 | - BOGER, R. H., Curr Opin Clin Nutr and Met Care, (20080000), vol. 11, pages 55 - 61 | - LIU et al., Am J Physiol Lung Cell Mol Physiol, (20060000), vol. 290, pages L2 - L10 |