|
14.02.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2019 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2019 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.01.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2019 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2019 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.01.2019 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
120 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2018 |
Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
114 |
|
20.12.2017 |
Description |
Opposition |
113 |
|
20.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2017 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2017 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.08.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
33 |
|
08.06.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.12.2016 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.11.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
02.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
25.10.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
07.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.05.2016 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
20.05.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
19.08.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
07.05.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
41 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
36 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
54 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
49 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
02.02.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.01.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
143 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
140 |
|
22.10.2014 |
Description |
Opposition |
140 |
|
22.10.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
84 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.04.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
58 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.07.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
222 |
|
28.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.09.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.09.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.09.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
06.09.2010 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.09.2010 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.09.2010 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
06.09.2010 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
06.09.2010 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.09.2010 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.08.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.08.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2010 |
Despatch of copy of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.08.2010 |
Result of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.08.2010 |
Result of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.08.2010 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
05.08.2010 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/429 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.07.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.2010 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.07.2010 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.06.2010 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
12.06.2010 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
12.06.2010 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.05.2010 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
121 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
106 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
203 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
114 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
195 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
111 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
223 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
208 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
8 |