EP2257227 - HERNIA STAPLER WITH INTEGRATED MESH MANIPULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TransEnterix, Inc. 635 Davis Drive, Suite 300 Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | [2014/20] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states Safestitch Medical, Inc. 4400 Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 670 Miami, FL 33137 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Christian 10090 Southwest 145 Street Miami FL 33176 / US | 02 /
ARP, Scott 17901 Southwest 91 Avenue Village Of Palmetto Bay FL 33157 / US | 03 /
AMID, Parviz 24620 Cordillera Drive Calabasas CA 91302 / US | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2010/49] | Application number, filing date | 09720716.1 | 13.03.2009 | [2010/49] | WO2009US37119 | Priority number, date | US20080036644P | 14.03.2008 Original published format: US 36644 P | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009114779 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2257227 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/115, A61B17/068, A61B17/04 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
A61B17/0684 (EP,US);
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B17/0644 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00349 (EP,US);
A61F2/0063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | KLAMMERGERÄT FÜR HERNIEN MIT INTEGRIERTEM NETZMANIPULATOR | [2010/49] | English: | HERNIA STAPLER WITH INTEGRATED MESH MANIPULATOR | [2010/49] | French: | AGRAFEUSE POUR HERNIE AVEC MANIPULATEUR DE FILET INTÉGRÉ | [2010/49] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 23.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/10] | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2013 | 31.03.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5220928 (ODDSEN ROBERT R [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11 * columns 11-14; figures 1,7,27 *; | [X]US5403326 (HARRISON MICHAEL R [US], et al) [X] 1,6-8,11 * columns 7-8; figure 8a *; | [X]US5893855 (JACOBS ROBERT A [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,11 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO0219920 (COLEMAN JAMES E [IE], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * pages 9-10 *; | [XA]US2003120289 (MCGUCKIN JAMES F [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [0032] - [0034] - [0041]; figure 4 *[A] 2-5,7-15; | [X]US2004138682 (ONUKI YOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,6-8,11-13 * paragraph [0068]; figures 1-2 *; | [X]WO2007030676 (UNIV SOUTH FLORIDA [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12,14,15 * page 9, line 25 - page 11, line 5; figures 1a, 2a,3b; claims 1,6 * | International search | [A]US5174487 (ROTHFUSS ROBERT G [US], et al); | [A]US5376097 (PHILLIPS EDWARD H [US]); | [X]US2004173659 (GREEN DAVID T [US], et al) |