|
02.02.2021 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
10 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
10 |
|
21.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
19.01.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2021 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2021 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2021 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2021 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.12.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.12.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.12.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2020 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.05.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
20 |
|
21.04.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
20 |
|
21.04.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
20 |
|
17.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2019 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2019 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.10.2019 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Request for a change of address - opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.10.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.10.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.10.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2019 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
55 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
27 |
|
09.11.2017 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2017 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.11.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
20 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Annex |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
22 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
24.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Matter concerning the application |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.12.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.12.2015 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
71 |
|
15.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2014 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2014 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
09.07.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
72 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.10.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.10.2012 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2012 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
13.02.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
13.02.2009 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.02.2009 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
13.02.2009 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
21 |