EP2349028 - USE OF EPINEURAL SHEATH GRAFTS FOR NEURAL REGENERATION AND PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2019 | New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION 9500 Euclid Avenue Cleveland, OH 44195 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states The Cleveland Clinic Foundation 9500 Euclid Avenue Cleveland, OH 44195 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEMIONOW, Maria 2832 West Park Shaker Heights OH 44120 / US | 02 /
SIEMIONOW, Krzysztof 2832 West Park Boulevard Shaker Heights OH 44120 / US | [2011/35] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
SIEMIONOW, Maria 2832 West Park Shaker Heights OH 44120 / US | ||
02 /
SIEMIONOW, Krzysztof 3269 Daleford Street Shaker Heights OH 44120 / US | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | Lock, Graham James, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09727903.8 | 02.04.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009US39258 | Priority number, date | US20080123026P | 04.04.2008 Original published format: US 123026 P | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009124170 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2349028 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32, A61B17/11 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
A61B17/1128 (EP,US);
A61B17/32002 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00349 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00969 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320044 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/31] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON EPINEURALEN HÜLSEN-GRAFTS ZUR NERVENREGENERATION UND ALS SCHUTZ | [2011/31] | English: | USE OF EPINEURAL SHEATH GRAFTS FOR NEURAL REGENERATION AND PROTECTION | [2011/31] | French: | UTILISATION DE GREFFONS DE GAINE ÉPINEURALE POUR RÉGÉNÉRATION ET PROTECTION NEURALE | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | 27.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/15] | 24.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.01.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 06.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 06.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.06.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 06.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 06.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.06.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 06.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 06.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.06.2011 | Decision despatched | 06.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 06.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.06.2011 | Decision despatched | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 17.07.2015 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004102772 (BAXTER JEFFREY W [US], et al) [X] 51-54 * figures 4,10B * * paragraphs [0061] , [0062] , [0077] , [0078] , [0092] *; | [X]US5085658 (MEYER WILLIAM F [US]) [X] 51-54 * figures 1,6,7 * * column 7, line 52 - column 10, line 22 *; | [X]US5577517 (BONUTTI PETER M [US]) [X] 51-54 * figures 1,14A * * column 5, lines 20-60 * * column 7, lines 27-42 *; | [X]US2002082632 (SPITZ GREGORY A [US], et al) [X] 51-54 * figures 1,1A * * paragraphs [0049] - [0089] *; | [X]EP1595503 (INRAD INC [US]) [X] 51,52 * figures 1,6 * * paragraphs [0030] - [0039] *; | [PX]WO2008115526 (RESTORATION ROBITICS INC [US], et al) [PX] 51-54 * figures 30a-30C,31A-31D,32A,37A,46A,46B * * paragraphs [0040] , [0164] - [0181] - [0201] * |