EP2262580 - COMPOSITE MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Manufacturing Europe BV 90156 Oudenstaart 1 5047 TK Tilburg / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Fujifilm Manufacturing Europe BV 90156 Oudenstaart 1 5047 TK Tilburg / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITAMI, Yujiro 90156, Oudenstaart 1 NL-5047 TK Tilburg / NL | [2010/51] | Representative(s) | Revell, Christopher, et al FUJIFILM Imaging Colorants Limited PO Box 42 Hexagon Tower Blackley Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | Mayall, John Avecia Limited Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 42 Hexagon House Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09731061.9 | 06.04.2009 | [2010/51] | WO2009GB50336 | Priority number, date | EP20080007073 | 08.04.2008 Original published format: EP 08007073 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009125218 | Date: | 15.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2262580 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/52, B01D69/10, B01D69/12, B01D67/00, B01D53/22 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
B01D71/5211 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/228 (EP,KR,US);
B01D67/0006 (EP,KR,US);
B01D69/10 (EP,KR,US);
B01D69/1213 (KR);
B01D69/125 (EP,KR,US);
C01B3/503 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2313/44 (KR);
B01D2323/345 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2323/40 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2323/42 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2323/66 (EP);
B01D2325/04 (KR);
C01B2203/0405 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/0475 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/0485 (EP,KR,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/51] | Title | German: | VERBUNDSTOFFMEMBRANEN | [2010/51] | English: | COMPOSITE MEMBRANES | [2010/51] | French: | MEMBRANES COMPOSITES | [2010/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 30.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 06.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JPH0824602 [ ]; | [DX]JPH0824602 (CHIKYU KANKYO SANGYO GIJUTSU, et al); | [DA]US5556449 (BAKER RICHARD W [US], et al); |