EP2271955 - OPTICAL IMAGING LENS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dharmatilleke, Saman 71 Chu Lin Road Singapore 669960 / SG | For all designated states Dharmatilleke, Medha 71 Chu Lin Road Singapore 669960 / SG | [2011/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DHARMATILLEKE, Saman 71 Chu Lin Road Singapore 669960 / SG | 02 /
FERNANDO, Eranga 4 Toh Tuck Link Level 3 Singapore 596226 / SG | 03 /
DHARMATILLEKE, Medha 71 Chu Lin Road Singapore 669960 / SG | [2011/02] | Representative(s) | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne 15 St Paul's Street Leeds LS1 2JG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne Pearl Chambers 22 East Parade Leeds LS1 5BY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09734718.1 | 23.04.2009 | [2011/02] | WO2009SG00151 | Priority number, date | WO2008SG00136 | 23.04.2008 Original published format: PCT/SG2008/000136 | [2011/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009131550 | Date: | 29.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2271955 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02B3/14 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
G02B3/14 (EP,KR,US);
G02B26/004 (KR);
G02B5/06 (EP,US);
G02B7/021 (KR);
G02B7/04 (KR);
G02B6/04 (EP,US);
G02B6/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/02] | Title | German: | LINSENSYSTEME FÜR OPTISCHE BILDGEBUNG | [2011/02] | English: | OPTICAL IMAGING LENS SYSTEMS | [2011/02] | French: | SYSTÈMES D IMAGERIE OPTIQUE À LENTILLES | [2011/02] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 04.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/18] | 03.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006245073 (YU TAI-CHERNG [KR]); | [X]WO2008024071 (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG], et al) |