EP2189696 - FIBER-REINFORCED RESIN PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/21] | TUBULAR BODY MADE OF FIBER REINFORCED RESIN | ||
[2018/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | For all designated states ARISAWA MFG. CO., LTD. 5-5, Minami-Honcho 1-chome Joetsu-shi Niigata 943-8610 / JP | [2010/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWASETSU, Nozomu c/o NAGASAKI Research & Development Center MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 717-1 Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki 851-0392 / JP | 02 /
NONAKA, Yoshinori c/o NAGASAKI Research & Development Center MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 717-1 Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki 851-0392 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Kenji c/o NAGASAKI Shipyard & Machinery Works MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1 Akunoura-machi Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki 850-8610 / JP | 04 /
ANDO, Koji c/o NAGASAKI Shipyard & Machinery Works MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1 Akunoura-machi Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki 850-8610 / JP | 05 /
TANAKA, Hiroshi c/o ARISAWA MFG. CO. LTD. 5-5 Minami-Honcho 1-chome Joetsu-shi Niigata 943-8610 / JP | 06 /
KAWAI, Yuuichi c/o ARISAWA MFG. CO. LTD. 5-5 Minami-Honcho 1-chome Joetsu-shi Niigata 943-8610 / JP | [2018/38] |
Former [2010/21] | 01 /
KAWASETSU, Nozomu c/o NAGASAKI Research & Development Center MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 717-1 Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki 851-0392 / JP | ||
02 /
NONAKA, Yoshinori c/o NAGASAKI Research & Development Center MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 717-1 Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki 851-0392 / JP | |||
03 /
TANAKA, Kenji c/o NAGASAKI Shipyard & Machinery Works MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1 Akunoura-machi Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki 850-8610 / JP | |||
04 /
ANDO, Koji c/o NAGASAKI Shipyard & Machinery Works MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1 Akunoura-machi Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki 850-8610 / JP | |||
05 /
TANAKA, Hiroshi c/o ARISAWA MFG. CO. LTD. 5-5 Minami-Honcho 1-chome Joetsu-shi Niigata 943-8610 / JP | |||
06 /
KAWAI, Yuuichi c/o ARISAWA MFG. CO. LTD. 5-5 Minami-Honcho 1-chome Joetsu-shi Niigata 943-8610 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/38] |
Former [2010/21] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09738762.5 | 24.04.2009 | [2010/21] | WO2009JP58205 | Priority number, date | JP20080119302 | 30.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008119302 | [2010/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009133825 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2189696 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2189696 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16L41/03, F16L41/08, F16L9/14, B01D61/10, B01D61/02, C02F1/44, C02F103/08 | [2017/08] | CPC: |
F16L9/14 (EP,US);
B01D61/10 (EP,US);
C02F1/441 (EP,US);
F16L41/03 (EP,US);
F16L41/08 (EP,US);
B01D2313/06 (EP,US);
B01D2313/10 (EP,US);
B01D61/025 (EP,US);
C02F2103/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/21] | F16L9/14, F16J15/10, F16L41/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/38] |
Former [2010/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ROHR AUS FASERVERSTÄRKTEM HARZ | [2018/33] | English: | FIBER-REINFORCED RESIN PIPE | [2018/33] | French: | TUYAU EN RÉSINE RENFORCÉE DE FIBRES | [2018/33] |
Former [2010/21] | RÖHRENFÖRMIGES ELEMENT AUS EINEM FASERVERSTÄRKTEN HARZ | ||
Former [2010/21] | TUBULAR BODY MADE OF FIBER REINFORCED RESIN | ||
Former [2010/21] | CORPS TUBULAIRE COMPOSÉ DE RÉSINE RENFORCÉE DE FIBRES | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2010 | Translation filed | 26.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 28.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 09.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2009 | AT | 19.09.2018 | CY | 19.09.2018 | CZ | 19.09.2018 | DK | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | FI | 19.09.2018 | HR | 19.09.2018 | LT | 19.09.2018 | LV | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | MK | 19.09.2018 | MT | 19.09.2018 | NL | 19.09.2018 | PL | 19.09.2018 | RO | 19.09.2018 | SE | 19.09.2018 | SI | 19.09.2018 | SK | 19.09.2018 | TR | 19.09.2018 | BG | 19.12.2018 | NO | 19.12.2018 | GR | 20.12.2018 | IS | 19.01.2019 | PT | 19.01.2019 | GB | 24.04.2019 | IE | 24.04.2019 | LU | 24.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 24.04.2009 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.04.2009 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 19.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4758688 (ASCHBERGER MATTHIAS [DE]) [A] 2,6* column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 11; figures 3-6 *; | [IA]US2008030021 (THEILEN DENNIS R [US]) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0024] - [0027]; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-4,8,10,12,14,16,18,20,22,24; | [XA]US2008093367 (GILBERTSON TERRY E [US], et al) [X] 5 * paragraphs [0014] , [0021] - [0023] - [0034]; figures 1-8 * [A] 6,7,9,11,13,15,17,19,21,23,25 | International search | [Y]JPH05164284 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JP2000346269 (ARON KASEI KK); | [Y]JP2004003583 (NIX INC); | [Y]JP2004205131 (GASTAR CORP, et al); | [A]JP2005279695 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al) | by applicant | JP3621058B | JP2006015573 | JP2006281619 | JP2006283879 |