EP2331719 - METHOD FOR THE SELECTIVE ACIDIC DEZINCIFICATION OF STEEL SCRAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DRT Deutsche Rohstofftechnik GmbH Rheinstr. 141 45478 Mülheim a. d. Ruhr / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Drt Deutsche Rohstofftechnik GmbH Rheinstr. 141 45478 Mülheim a. d. Ruhr / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOCK, Eberhard Kiefernbrink 16 38640 Goslar / DE | 02 /
PILLKAHN, Hans-Bernd Selvestr. 51 58791 Werdohl / DE | 03 /
MEYNERTS, Udo Rheinstr. 141 45478 Mülheim a. d. Ruhr / DE | [2011/24] | Representative(s) | Schöneborn, Holger Schneiders & Behrendt PartmbB Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestraße 23 (Kortumkarree) 44787 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Schöneborn, Holger Schneiders & Behrendt Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 44787 Bochum / DE | ||
Former [2011/24] | Schöneborn, Holger Schneiders & Behrendt Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 44787 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 09744322.0 | 23.09.2009 | [2011/24] | WO2009EP06846 | Priority number, date | DE20081048493 | 23.09.2008 Original published format: DE102008048493 | [2011/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010034465 | Date: | 01.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2331719 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2331719 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/01] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2331719 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C22B19/30, C22B7/00, C22B1/00, C22B3/08 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
C22B7/007 (EP,US);
C22B1/005 (EP,US);
C22B19/30 (EP,US);
C22B3/08 (EP,US);
C23F1/30 (EP);
C23F1/44 (EP);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SELEKTIVEN SAUREN ENTZINKUNG VON STAHLSCHROTTEN | [2011/24] | English: | METHOD FOR THE SELECTIVE ACIDIC DEZINCIFICATION OF STEEL SCRAP | [2011/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉZINGAGE ACIDE SÉLECTIF DE FERRAILLES D'ACIER | [2011/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 23.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 01.01.2014 | CY | 01.01.2014 | DK | 01.01.2014 | EE | 01.01.2014 | FI | 01.01.2014 | HR | 01.01.2014 | LT | 01.01.2014 | LV | 01.01.2014 | MC | 01.01.2014 | MK | 01.01.2014 | MT | 01.01.2014 | RO | 01.01.2014 | SI | 01.01.2014 | SK | 01.01.2014 | SM | 01.01.2014 | NO | 01.04.2014 | GR | 02.04.2014 | IS | 01.05.2014 | PT | 02.05.2014 | AT | 23.09.2014 | IE | 23.09.2014 | LU | 23.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/28] | BG | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
AT | 23.09.2014 | ||
IE | 23.09.2014 | ||
LU | 23.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
AT | 23.09.2014 | ||
IE | 23.09.2014 | ||
LU | 23.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
AT | 23.09.2014 | ||
IE | 23.09.2014 | ||
LU | 23.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
AT | 23.09.2014 | ||
IE | 23.09.2014 | ||
LU | 23.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
IE | 23.09.2014 | ||
LU | 23.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
LU | 23.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
LU | 23.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
LU | 23.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
LU | 23.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 01.01.2014 | |
IS | 01.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2156316 (PRAYON) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 17 - page 2, line 34; example 1; claims 1-7 *; | [A]DE102007001190 (WET PROTECT GMBH [DE]) [A] 2,3,7-9,15 * claims 6,7,10-13 *; | [A]FR2737673 (EUROP DE DEZINGAGE COMP [FR]) [A] 1,14 * claims 1,8 *; | [AD]GB2334969 (BRITISH STEEL PLC [GB]) [AD] 1,15 * page 5 - page 6; claims 1-7 *; | [A]JPH04280933 ; | [T]DE102008016323 (PILLKAHN HANS BERND [DE], et al) [T] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 46, Database accession no. 1992-378938, XP002567051 & JPH04280933 A 19921006 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1,5,6,11 * abstract * |