Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2313068

EP2313068 - ORAL COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.08.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
01.06.2019Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
01.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
[2011/17]
Inventor(s)01 / NOWAK, Andrew
249 Tanglewood Drive
Piscataway NJ 08854 / US
02 / PILCH, Shira
909 South Park Avenue
Highland Park NJ 08904 / US
03 / MASTERS, Jim
1 Stephen Court
Ringoes NJ 08551 / US
 [2011/17]
Representative(s)Wibbelmann, Jobst , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/17]Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
Application number, filing date09747658.415.05.2009
[2011/17]
WO2009US44100
Priority number, dateUS20080053863P16.05.2008         Original published format: US 53863 P
[2011/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009140577
Date:19.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2313068
Date:27.04.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2009
[2011/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/25, A61Q11/00
[2011/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/17]
TitleGerman:ORALE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND IHRE ANWENDUNGEN[2011/17]
English:ORAL COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF[2011/17]
French:COMPOSITIONS BUCCALES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2011/17]
Entry into regional phase16.12.2010National basic fee paid 
16.12.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.03.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/17]
22.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.05.2017
18.05.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
23.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination23.08.2017Appeal received No.  T2519/17
20.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
27.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.07.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2007078630  (HUBER CORP J M [US]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2007078651  (HUBER CORP J M [US]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO0185115  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2007134003  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US], et al) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2007111877  (HUBER CORP J M [US], et al) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2006057718  (HUBER CORP J M [US]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2006057716  (HUBER CORP J M [US]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2006057717  (HUBER CORP J M [US]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5651958  (RICE DAVID EARL [US]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2004045504  (HUBER CORP J M [US]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2004043419  (HUBER CORP J M [US]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2003206874
 US3959458
 US3937807
 US4051234
 US3535421
 US4842847
 US5000939
 US4992420
 US4355022
 US4154815
 US4058595
 US3991177
 US3696191