EP2358214 - USE OF CANTHAXANTHIN AND/OR 25-OH D3 FOR IMPROVED HATCHABILITY IN POULTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Revocation of patent | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERNANDEZ, Jose-Maria Im Wuhrenberg 17 CH-4312 Magden / CH | 02 /
WEBER, Gilbert Im Hofacker 5 CH-4312 Magden / CH | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Schwander, Kuno, et al DSM Nutritional Products AG Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [2012/28] |
Former [2011/34] | Schwander, Kuno DSM Nutritional Products, Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | Application number, filing date | 09748799.5 | 11.11.2009 | [2011/34] | WO2009EP64963 | Priority number, date | EP20080020153 | 19.11.2008 Original published format: EP 08020153 | [2011/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010057811 | Date: | 27.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2358214 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2358214 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A23K1/16, A23K1/18 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/593 (EP,US);
A61K31/125 (KR);
A23K20/105 (EP,US);
A23K20/174 (EP,US);
A23K20/179 (EP,US);
A23K50/75 (EP,US);
A61K31/122 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON CANTHAXANTHIN UND/ODER 25-OH D3 ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES AUSSCHLÜPFENS IN GEFLÜGEL | [2013/27] | English: | USE OF CANTHAXANTHIN AND/OR 25-OH D3 FOR IMPROVED HATCHABILITY IN POULTRY | [2011/34] | French: | UTILISATION DE LA CANTHAXANTHIN ET/OU DU 25-OH D3 POUR L'AMELIORATION DE L'ECLOSION CHEZ LA VOLAILLE | [2013/27] |
Former [2011/34] | VERWENDUNG VON CANTHAXANTHIN UND/ODER 25-OH-D3 ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER SCHLÜPFRATE BEI GEFLÜGEL | ||
Former [2011/34] | UTILISATION DE LA CANTHAXANTHINE ET/OU DE 25-OH D3 POUR AMÉLIORER L'ÉCLOSIVITÉ CHEZ DES VOLAILLES | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 31.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 08.08.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.02.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.07.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 02.06.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/31] | Appeal following opposition | 22.09.2016 | Appeal received No. T2187/16 | 25.11.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.04.2020 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2020/14] | 02.06.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 02.10.2013 | CY | 02.10.2013 | DK | 02.10.2013 | EE | 02.10.2013 | FI | 02.10.2013 | HR | 02.10.2013 | LT | 02.10.2013 | LV | 02.10.2013 | MC | 02.10.2013 | MK | 02.10.2013 | MT | 02.10.2013 | SE | 02.10.2013 | SI | 02.10.2013 | SM | 02.10.2013 | IE | 11.11.2013 | LU | 11.11.2013 | NO | 01.01.2014 | GR | 03.01.2014 | IS | 02.02.2014 | PT | 03.02.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2016/21] | BG | 02.10.2013 | |
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
GR | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 11.11.2013 | ||
LU | 11.11.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/41] | BG | 02.10.2013 | |
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
GR | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 11.11.2013 | ||
LU | 11.11.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | BG | 02.10.2013 | |
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
GR | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 11.11.2013 | ||
LU | 11.11.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | BG | 02.10.2013 | |
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 11.11.2013 | ||
LU | 11.11.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 11.11.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 11.11.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 11.11.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 02.10.2013 | |
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 02.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0156401 (AVENTIS ANIMAL NUTRITION SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 1, lines 4-15 * * page 2, lines 1-15 * * claims 1,7-12 *; | [A] - Robert F, Panheleux- Le Bastard M, Hamelin C, Boulard C, "Effects of canthaxanthin supplementation in the ROSS breeder diet on oxidative stress of chicks", (20070830), pages 731 - 734, 16th European Symposium on Poultry Nutrition, 26-30/08/2007, URL: http://www.cabi.org/animalscience/Uploads/File/AnimalScience/additionalFiles/WPSAStrasbourgAug2007/64.pdf, (20100128), XP002565950 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * table 2 * | [A] - CHANG-HYEUG KIM ET AL, "Effects of dietary xanthophylls and seaweed by-products on growth performance, color and antioxidant properties in broiler chicks", HAN-GUG CHUGSAN SIGPUM HAG-HOEJI - KOREAN SOCIETY FOR FOOD SCIENCE OF ANIMAL RESOURCES, HAN-GUG CHUGSAN SIGPUM HAG-HOEJI, KR, (20040601), vol. 24, no. 2, ISSN 1225-8563, pages 128 - 134, XP009128663 [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - PEREZ-VENDRELL AM ET AL, "Influence of source and ratio of xanthophyll pigments on broiler chicken pigmentation and performance", POULTRY SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 80, pages 320 - 326, XP002565951 [A] 1-8 * pages 321-322 * * table 3 * | [A] - MCGRAW KJ, KLASING KC, "Carotenoids, immunity, and integumentary coloration in red junglefowl (Gallus Gallus)", THE AUK, (2006), vol. 123, no. 4, pages 1161 - 1171, XP002565952 [A] 1-8 * pages 1162-3 * * pages 1168-9 * | [A] - CUCCO M, GUASCO B, MALACARNE G, OTTONELLI R, "Effects of B-carotene on adult immune condition and antibacterial activity in the eggs of the Grey Partridge, Perdix perdix", COMPARATIVE BIOCHEMISTRY AND PHYSIOLOGY, (2007), vol. 147, no. A, pages 1038 - 1046, XP002565953 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 1042 * * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cbpa.2007.03.014 | [X] - ATENCIO A ET AL, "TWENTY-FIVE HYDROXYCHOLECALCIFEROL AS A CHOLECALCIFEROL SUBSTITUTE IN BROILER BREEDER HEN DIETS AND ITS EFFECT ON THE PERFORMANCE AND GENERAL HEALTH OF THE PROGENY", POULTRY SCIENCE, CHAMPAIGN, IL, US, (20050801), vol. 84, no. 8, ISSN 0032-5791, pages 1277 - 1285, XP009074311 [X] 1-6 * abstract * * table 1 * * figures 2-4 * | [XI] - SOARES J H ET AL, "THE EFFECTIVENESS OF THE VITAMIN D ANALOG 1 .ALPHA.-OH-D3 IN PROMOTING FERTILITY AND HATCHABILITY IN THE LAYING HEN", POULTRY SCIENCE, CHAMPAIGN, IL, US, (19790101), vol. 58, no. 4, ISSN 0032-5791, pages 1004 - 1006, XP009074301 [X] 1,5 * abstract * * page 1004 * * tables 1,2 * [I] 2-4,6 | by applicant | US2003170324 | US2005064018 | US5695794 | US5043170 | WO03007916 | WO03086415 |