EP2286259 - MULTI-FREQUENCY BAND RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states Fraunhofer Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Wissenschaft E.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÜGAMER, Alexander Paradeis 5 97342 Obernbreit / DE | 02 /
URQUIJO TARDIO, Santiago St. Johan 6-191 91056 Erlangen / DE | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09757245.7 | 29.05.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009EP03874 | Priority number, date | DE20081026698 | 04.06.2008 Original published format: DE102008026698 | [2011/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009146862 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2286259 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2286259 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/37, G01S19/13, G01S19/32 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
G01S19/36 (EP,US);
G01S19/13 (EP,US);
G01S19/32 (EP,US);
G01S19/33 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/08] | G01S1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | MEHRFREQUENZBAND-EMPFÄNGER | [2011/08] | English: | MULTI-FREQUENCY BAND RECEIVER | [2011/08] | French: | RÉCEPTEUR À BANDE MULTIFRÉQUENCE | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 04.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2009 | CY | 28.12.2011 | CZ | 28.12.2011 | DK | 28.12.2011 | EE | 28.12.2011 | HR | 28.12.2011 | LT | 28.12.2011 | LV | 28.12.2011 | MK | 28.12.2011 | MT | 28.12.2011 | PL | 28.12.2011 | RO | 28.12.2011 | SI | 28.12.2011 | SK | 28.12.2011 | BG | 28.03.2012 | GR | 29.03.2012 | IS | 28.04.2012 | LU | 29.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
LU | 29.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 28.12.2011 | |
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 28.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DX]US2007096980 (GRADINCIC ZLATAN [US], et al) [DX] 1-22 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * paragraphs [0017] - [0026] *; | [A]US2007159385 (LAWRENCE DAVID G [US]) [A] 1,21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0020]; figures 1,2 ** paragraphs [0028] - [0048] *; | [DX] - PIZZARULLI A ET AL, Reconfigurable and simultaneous dual band Galileo/GPS front-end receiver in 0.13Î 1/4 m RFCMOS, POSITION, LOCATION AND NAVIGATION SYMPOSIUM, 2008 IEEE/ION, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, PAGE(S) 846 - 850, (20080505), ISBN 978-1-4244-1536-6, XP031288932 [DX] 1-22 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * columns 1-6 * | [A] - L. MARRADI ET AL., "The Galileo Ground Segment Reference Receiver Development: Architecture and Critical Design Issues", ION GPS/GNSS 2003, Portland, U.S.A., (20030912), pages 1929 - 1940, XP002545256 [A] 1-22 * abstract * * columns 3,4,9-11; figures 4,5 * | [A] - D. AKOS ET AL., "A Prototyping Platform for Multi-Frequency GNSS Receivers", ION GPS/GNSS 2003, Portland, U.S.A., (20030912), pages 117 - 128, XP002545261 [A] 1-22 * abstract * * columns 4-7; figures 1-6,13 * | by applicant | WO2006085255 | - L. MARRADI ET AL., "The Galileo Ground Segment Reference Receiver Development: Architecture and Critical Design Issues", ION GPS/GNSS 2003, (20030912), pages 1929 - 1940, XP002545256 | - D. AKOS ET AL., "A Prototyping Platform for Multi-Frequency GNSS Receivers", ION GPS/GNSS 2003, (20030912), pages 117 - 128, XP002545261 |