EP2398668 - TRANSFERRING ELECTRICAL ENERGY BETWEEN AN ELECTRIC VEHICLE AND A POWER DISTRIBUTION GRID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.02.2017 [2017/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2011/52] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 Munich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WERNER, Thomas An der Maisenlach 43 91126 Rednitzhembach / DE | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/52] | Application number, filing date | 09776396.5 | 18.02.2009 | WO2009EP01301 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010094302 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2398668 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
G06Q50/06 (EP,US);
B60L53/305 (EP,US);
B60L53/62 (EP,US);
B60L53/65 (EP,US);
B60L53/66 (EP,US);
B60L53/665 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T90/12 (EP,US);
Y02T90/14 (US);
Y02T90/16 (EP,US);
Y02T90/167 (EP,US);
Y04S30/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/52] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNG ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE ZWISCHEN EINEM ELEKTROFAHRZEUG UND EINEM ENERGIEVERTEILUNGSNETZ | [2011/52] | English: | TRANSFERRING ELECTRICAL ENERGY BETWEEN AN ELECTRIC VEHICLE AND A POWER DISTRIBUTION GRID | [2011/52] | French: | TRANSMISSION D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE ENTRE UN VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE ET UN RÉSEAU DE DISTRIBUTION D'ÉNERGIE | [2011/52] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 04.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/05] | 23.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002158749 (IKEDA MASAKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 1, paragraph 15 - page 2, paragraph 24 * * page 2, paragraph 38 - page 3, paragraph 53; figures 1-5 * * page 4, paragraph 60 - page 6, paragraph 81; figures 8-12 * * abstract *; | [A]GB2438979 (ELEKTROMOTIVE LTD [GB]) [A] 1-11 * page 12, line 11 - page 15, line 30 * * page 18, line 3 - page 20, line 2 * * figures 3,6-8 * * abstract *; | [A]EP1995109 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 46 - column 7, line 54; figures 1,2 ** abstract * |