EP2331368 - REINFORCEMENT WITH CHANNEL DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] | 29.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2011/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELPAIRE, Vincent Rue de Boetendael 39 B-1180 Uccle / BE | [2011/24] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/03] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2011/24] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technologies AG Tüffenwies 16-22 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 09782454.4 | 01.09.2009 | [2011/24] | WO2009EP61271 | Priority number, date | EP20080163414 | 01.09.2008 Original published format: EP 08163414 | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010023325 | Date: | 04.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2331368 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2331368 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/08, B62D29/00 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
B60R13/08 (EP,KR,US);
B60R13/00 (KR);
B62D29/00 (KR);
B62D29/001 (US);
B62D29/002 (EP,US);
B62D29/004 (US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] |
Former [2011/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKUNG MIT KANALAUSFÜHRUNG | [2011/24] | English: | REINFORCEMENT WITH CHANNEL DESIGN | [2011/24] | French: | RENFORCEMENT AVEC CONCEPT DE CANAL | [2011/24] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 24.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.10.2017
ADMISSIBLE L & L Products Europe S.A.S. 1, Rue Lindberg ZA Activeum, Altorf 67129 Molsheim, Cedex / FR Opponent's representative Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.10.2017
ADMISSIBLE L & L Products Europe S.A.S. 1, Rue Lindberg ZA Activeum, Altorf 67129 Molsheim, Cedex / FR Opponent's representative Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | 12.02.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.06.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.10.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.10.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.07.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/35] | 21.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 10.12.2019 | Appeal received No. T3246/19 | 10.02.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.07.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 21.07.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 04.07.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2009 | AT | 18.01.2017 | CY | 18.01.2017 | CZ | 18.01.2017 | DK | 18.01.2017 | EE | 18.01.2017 | ES | 18.01.2017 | FI | 18.01.2017 | HR | 18.01.2017 | IT | 18.01.2017 | LT | 18.01.2017 | LV | 18.01.2017 | MC | 18.01.2017 | MK | 18.01.2017 | NL | 18.01.2017 | PL | 18.01.2017 | RO | 18.01.2017 | SE | 18.01.2017 | SI | 18.01.2017 | SK | 18.01.2017 | SM | 18.01.2017 | TR | 18.01.2017 | BG | 18.04.2017 | NO | 18.04.2017 | GR | 19.04.2017 | IS | 18.05.2017 | PT | 18.05.2017 | IE | 01.09.2017 | LU | 01.09.2017 | MT | 01.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | GB | 01.09.2021 | [2022/35] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 01.09.2009 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
TR | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 01.09.2017 | ||
LU | 01.09.2017 | ||
MT | 01.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 01.09.2009 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 01.09.2017 | ||
LU | 01.09.2017 | ||
MT | 01.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 01.09.2009 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 01.09.2017 | ||
LU | 01.09.2017 | ||
MT | 01.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.09.2009 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 01.09.2017 | ||
LU | 01.09.2017 | ||
MT | 01.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 01.09.2017 | ||
LU | 01.09.2017 | ||
MT | 01.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 01.09.2017 | ||
LU | 01.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 01.09.2017 | ||
LU | 01.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1149679 ; | [X]FR2749263 (RENAULT [FR]); | [A]EP1064188 (MOELLER PLAST GMBH [DE]); | [A]JP2007084015 (IDA SANGYO KK) | Opposition | JPH0731569 | FR2749263 | JP2000211551 | JP2001062833 | JP2001199362 | US6305136 | EP1149679 | US6311452 | EP1064188 | US2002088908 | US6475577 | US6729425 | US2004224108 | US2004262853 | EP1541449 | US2005172486 | US2005212332 | EP1609577 | US7141194 | JP2007084015 | US2007090666 | WO2007082677 | WO2007098464 | EP1930231 | WO2008071792 | US2008143143 | US2008150323 | WO2008077944 | EP1946995 | WO2009083535 |