EP2344308 - POLYISOCYANATE COMPOSITION USED FOR BINDING LIGNOCELLULOSIC MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huntsman International LLC 500 Huntsman Way Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US | [2011/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHANOPOULOS, Christopher Sterrebeeklaan 79 B-3080 Moorsel / BE | 02 /
PANS, Griet Hoeledensebaan 43 B-3471 Hoeleden / BE | [2011/29] | Representative(s) | Swinnen, Anne-Marie, et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/29] | Swinnen, Anne-Marie, et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | Application number, filing date | 09783942.7 | 12.10.2009 | [2011/29] | WO2009EP63262 | Priority number, date | EP20080168485 | 06.11.2008 Original published format: EP 08168485 | [2011/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010052096 | Date: | 14.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2344308 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B27N3/00, C08G18/64, C08L97/02, C08G18/76 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
C08G18/7664 (EP,US);
C08G18/6492 (EP,US);
C08L97/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L97/02, C08L2666/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/29] | Title | German: | ZUM BINDEN VON LIGNOZELLULOSEMATERIALIEN VERWENDETE POLYISOCYANATZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2011/29] | English: | POLYISOCYANATE COMPOSITION USED FOR BINDING LIGNOCELLULOSIC MATERIALS | [2011/29] | French: | COMPOSITION DE POLYISOCYANATE UTILISÉE POUR LIER DES MATÉRIAUX LIGNO-CELLULOSIQUES | [2011/29] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 31.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 09.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]AU677060B (BAYER AG) [X] 1-6,9 * page 1, lines 1-8 * * examples 1-6; tables 1,2 * [Y] 7,8; | [X]US4528117 (SCHOLL HANS-JOACHIM [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9 * column 1, lines 8-11 * * column 8, line 30 - column 9, line 11 * * column 11, lines 11-17,31-35 * * example 3 *; | [Y]US2003203998 (GRES EDWARD M [CA]) [Y] 7,8 * example 3 * * claims 1-4 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0016] , [0061] - [0064] * |