EP2326691 - SELF-ETCHING CEMENTITIOUS SUBSTRATE COATING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/22] | SELF-ETCHING CEMENTITIOUS SUBSTRATE COATING COMPOSITION | ||
[2014/45] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWIMC LLC 101 West Prospect Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US | [2019/01] |
Former [2011/22] | For all designated states Valspar Sourcing, Inc. 901 3rd Ave. South P.O. Box 1461 Minneapolis, MN 55440-1461 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KILLILEA, Howard, T. 70 Deer Hills Court North Oaks MN 55127 / US | 02 /
WILDMAN, Michael, C. 1715 N. Newport Road Hoffman Estates IL 60169 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Bruce, A. 3204 Jasmine Court Crystal Lake IL 60012 / US | 04 /
WEBER, Carl, H. 2710 Killarney Drive Cary IL 60013-1530 / US | [2011/22] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/19] |
Former [2014/45] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/22] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09791507.8 | 13.08.2009 | [2014/45] | WO2009US53789 | Priority number, date | US20080089446P | 15.08.2008 Original published format: US 89446 P | [2011/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010019825 | Date: | 18.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2326691 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2326691 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2326691 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09D201/00, C08K5/54, C09D201/10 | [2011/22] | CPC: |
C09D143/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/54 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] |
Former [2011/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SELBSTÄTZENDE BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR ZEMENTÖSE SUBSTRATE | [2014/45] | English: | SELF-ETCHING CEMENTITIOUS SUBSTRATE COATING COMPOSITION | [2014/45] | French: | COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT DE SUBSTRAT DE CIMENT À MORDANÇAGE AUTOMATIQUE | [2014/45] |
Former [2011/22] | SELBSTÄTZENDE BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR ZEMENTHALTIGES SUBSTRAT | ||
Former [2011/22] | SELF-ETCHING CEMENTITIOUS SUBSTRATE COATING COMPOSITION | ||
Former [2011/22] | COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT DE SUBSTRAT DE CIMENT À MORDANÇAGE AUTOMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/22] | 06.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.07.2015
22.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE REDCO N.V. Kuiermanstraat 1 B-1880 Kapelle-op-den-Bos / BE Opponent's representative Vaeck, Elke Etex Services NV Kuiermansstraat 1 1880 Kapelle-op-den-Bos / BE | 02
31.07.2015
05.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67058 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.07.2015
22.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE REDCO N.V. Kuiermanstraat 1 B-1880 Kapelle-op-den-Bos / BE Opponent's representative Vaeck, Elke Redco NV Intellectual Property Service Center Etex Group Kuiermansstraat 1 1880 Kapelle-op-den-Bos / BE | ||
02
31.07.2015
05.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67058 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative BASF IP Association BASF SE ZRX-C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
Former [2015/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.07.2015
22.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE REDCO N.V. Kuiermanstraat 1 B-1880 Kapelle-op-den-Bos / BE Opponent's representative Vaeck, Elke Redco NV Intellectual Property Service Center Etex Group Kuiermansstraat 1 1880 Kapelle-op-den-Bos / BE | ||
02
31.07.2015
05.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67058 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Beckmann, Illenora BASF SE Global Intellectual Property ZRX/D - C006 DE-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
Former [2015/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.07.2015
22.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE REDCO N.V. Kuiermanstraat 1 B-1880 Kapelle-op-den-Bos / BE Opponent's representative Vaeck, Elke Redco NV Intellectual Property Service Center Etex Group Kuiermansstraat 1 1880 Kapelle-op-den-Bos / BE | 14.09.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.03.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.03.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.03.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.07.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 25.02.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 29.05.2019 | Appeal received No. T1599/19 | 19.07.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.08.2009 | AT | 05.11.2014 | BE | 05.11.2014 | BG | 05.11.2014 | CY | 05.11.2014 | CZ | 05.11.2014 | DK | 05.11.2014 | EE | 05.11.2014 | ES | 05.11.2014 | FI | 05.11.2014 | HR | 05.11.2014 | LT | 05.11.2014 | LV | 05.11.2014 | MC | 05.11.2014 | MK | 05.11.2014 | MT | 05.11.2014 | NL | 05.11.2014 | PL | 05.11.2014 | RO | 05.11.2014 | SE | 05.11.2014 | SI | 05.11.2014 | SK | 05.11.2014 | SM | 05.11.2014 | TR | 05.11.2014 | NO | 05.02.2015 | GR | 06.02.2015 | IS | 05.03.2015 | PT | 05.03.2015 | IE | 13.08.2015 | LU | 13.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/46] | HU | 13.08.2009 | |
AT | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
SM | 05.11.2014 | ||
TR | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 13.08.2015 | ||
LU | 13.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 13.08.2009 | |
AT | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
SM | 05.11.2014 | ||
TR | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 13.08.2015 | ||
LU | 13.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 13.08.2015 | ||
LU | 13.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 13.08.2015 | ||
LU | 13.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 13.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 13.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 13.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 05.11.2014 | |
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 05.11.2014 | |
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 05.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2007059516 (VALSPAR SOURCING INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2007143622 (VALSPAR SOURCING INC [US], et al); | [ADP]US2009035587 (KILLILEA T HOWARD [US], et al) | by applicant | WO9845222 | US5962571 | WO0168547 | US6762230 | AU2005100347 | US2005208285 | US2006135684 | US2006135686 | US2006288909 | US2007110981 | WO2007090132 | WO2007089807 | US2007259166 | US2007259188 | US2009035587 | AU20090060655 | Opposition | EP0764699 | WO2006110331 | US2007265391 | WO2007006413 |