EP2334365 - BIASING A CATHETER BALLOON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | [2011/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAZZONE, James 4100 Hamline Ave. St. Paul, Minnesota 55112 / US | 02 /
CHEUNG, Desmond 998 Bidwell Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | [2011/25] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 12 10719 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2014/27] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 12 10719 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2011/25] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09792702.4 | 18.09.2009 | [2011/25] | WO2009US57452 | Priority number, date | US20080099021P | 22.09.2008 Original published format: US 99021 P | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010033785 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2334365 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2334365 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/10, A61M25/00, A61M25/06 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
A61M25/1006 (EP,US);
A61M25/10 (KR);
A61M25/09 (KR);
A61M29/02 (KR);
A61M2025/0004 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0681 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1013 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1061 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1068 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/25] | A61M25/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] |
Former [2011/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORSPANNUNG EINES KATHETERBALLONS | [2011/25] | English: | BIASING A CATHETER BALLOON | [2011/25] | French: | SOLLICITATION D'UN BALLONNET DE CATHÉTER | [2011/25] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 07.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2009 | AT | 26.10.2016 | BE | 26.10.2016 | CY | 26.10.2016 | CZ | 26.10.2016 | DK | 26.10.2016 | EE | 26.10.2016 | ES | 26.10.2016 | FI | 26.10.2016 | HR | 26.10.2016 | IT | 26.10.2016 | LT | 26.10.2016 | LV | 26.10.2016 | MC | 26.10.2016 | MK | 26.10.2016 | NL | 26.10.2016 | PL | 26.10.2016 | RO | 26.10.2016 | SE | 26.10.2016 | SI | 26.10.2016 | SK | 26.10.2016 | SM | 26.10.2016 | TR | 26.10.2016 | BG | 26.01.2017 | NO | 26.01.2017 | GR | 27.01.2017 | IS | 26.02.2017 | PT | 27.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 18.09.2009 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 18.09.2009 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.09.2009 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 26.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1288033 (LAMBERT ET AL) [A] 1,16 * page 3, lines 25-36; figure 3 *; | [XA]US4315512 (FOGARTY THOMAS J) [X] 1 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 54; figures 1-6 * [A] 14,16; | [A]US5209727 (RADISCH JR HERBERT R [US], et al) [A] 1,16 * column 3, line 44 - column 6, line 25; figure 2 *; | [XA]US5423755 (KESTEN RANDY J [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, lines 47-56 * * column 5, lines 46-51; figure 1 * * column 6, lines 16-33; figures 7,8 * * abstract * [A] 14-16; | [X]EP0724891 (CORDIS EUROP [NL]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP1120129 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0051] - [0089]; figures 1-12 * [Y] 7-13,16-19; | [A]JP2001238953 (NIPPON ZEON CO) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]WO0207625 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1,16 * page 16, line 9 - page 17, line 6; figure 7 *; | [A]US6733439 (ZIGLER ARIE [US]) [A] 1,16 * abstract *; | [AY]US2005177147 (VANCELETTE DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0044]; figure 8 * [Y] 7-13,16-19,14-17,19,20; | [XY]WO2008000066 (CRYOCATH TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]) [X] 1,5-13 * page 3, line 20 - page 9, line 16; figures 1-8 * [Y] 14-17,19,20; | [PX]WO2009009472 (WILSON COOK MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [PX] 1,5 * paragraphs [0061] - [0076]; figures 19-25 * | by applicant | WO2008000066 |