EP2305164 - DENTAL DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/14] | DENTAL CHARGER | ||
[2015/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DXM Co., Ltd. 1003, 1003-1Ilsan Techno Town Bldg. 1141-1 Baekseok 1-dong Ilsan Dong-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 410-722 / KR | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Du-Rok 1303 Hansol Preeminent Officetel 852-1 Janghang 2(i)-dong IlsanDong-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 410-837 / KR | 02 /
SHIN, Kyoung-Soo 901-901 Baeksong Maeul 9-danji Doosan Apt. 1140 Baekseok 1-dong IlsanDong-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 410-721 / KR | [2015/52] |
Former [2011/14] | 01 /
JUNG, Du-Rok 1303 Hansol Preeminent Officetel 852-1 Janghang 2(i)-dong IlsanDong-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 410-837 / KR | ||
02 /
SHIN, Kyoung-Soo 901-901 Baeksong Maeul 9-danji Doosan Apt. 1140 Baekseok 1-dong IlsanDong-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 410-721 / KR | Representative(s) | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/52] | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/14] | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09794622.2 | 06.07.2009 | [2011/14] | WO2009KR03683 | Priority number, date | KR20080009066U | 08.07.2008 Original published format: KR 20080009066 U | [2011/14] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010005216 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2305164 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2305164 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/06, B05C17/005 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
A61C5/62 (EP,KR,US);
A61C5/55 (EP,KR,US);
A61C1/07 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2011/14] | A61C5/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] |
Former [2011/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DENTALER SPENDER | [2015/24] | English: | DENTAL DISPENSER | [2015/24] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DENTAIRE | [2015/24] |
Former [2011/14] | DENTALES LADEGERÄT | ||
Former [2011/14] | DENTAL CHARGER | ||
Former [2011/14] | DISTRIBUTEUR DE CHARGE DENTAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2011 | Translation filed | 05.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 28.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.07.2009 | AT | 23.12.2015 | BE | 23.12.2015 | BG | 23.12.2015 | CY | 23.12.2015 | CZ | 23.12.2015 | DK | 23.12.2015 | EE | 23.12.2015 | ES | 23.12.2015 | FI | 23.12.2015 | HR | 23.12.2015 | IT | 23.12.2015 | LT | 23.12.2015 | LV | 23.12.2015 | MC | 23.12.2015 | MK | 23.12.2015 | NL | 23.12.2015 | PL | 23.12.2015 | RO | 23.12.2015 | SE | 23.12.2015 | SI | 23.12.2015 | SK | 23.12.2015 | SM | 23.12.2015 | TR | 23.12.2015 | NO | 23.03.2016 | GR | 24.03.2016 | IS | 23.04.2016 | PT | 26.04.2016 | GB | 06.07.2016 | IE | 06.07.2016 | LU | 06.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | FR | 01.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 06.07.2009 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
GB | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 06.07.2016 | ||
LU | 06.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 06.07.2009 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
GB | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 06.07.2016 | ||
LU | 06.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 06.07.2009 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
GB | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 06.07.2016 | ||
LU | 06.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
GB | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 06.07.2016 | ||
LU | 06.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
GB | 06.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 23.12.2015 | |
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 23.12.2015 | |
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 23.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1190681 (ADDENT INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 6 ** figure 7 *; | [A]US2002086264 (OKAWA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph 14 - page 6, paragraph 85 * * claims 1-20 * * figure 6 *; | [A]WO2006104314 (BNL BIOTECH CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - line 14 * * page 6, line 22 - page 9, line 18 * * page 15, line 6 - line 30 * * claims 1-19 * * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2002143183 (MORITA MFG); | [A]KR20060104907 (BNL BIOTECH CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20060122195 (LEE IN WHAN [KR]) | Examination | KR20080080470 |