EP2324455 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR USING SUPPLEMENTAL CONTENT ITEMS FOR SEARCH CRITERIA FOR IDENTIFYING OTHER CONTENT ITEMS OF INTEREST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOKTURK, Salih, Burak 3773 Redwood Circle Palo Alto CA 94306 / US | 02 /
YANG, Danny 1127 Foster City Boulevard, 4 Foster City CA 94404 / US | 03 /
DALAL, Navneet 730 Bounty Dr. Apt. 3020 Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 04 /
SHAH, Munjal 1745 Waverly Street Palo Alto CA 94301 / US | 05 /
GOODMAN, Marissa 2984 Clay St. 5 San Francisco CA 94115 / US | [2011/21] | Representative(s) | Robinson, David Edward Ashdown, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Schley, Jan Malte Fish & Richardson P.C. HighLight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Str. 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/21] | Potter, Julian Mark W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09798677.2 | 14.07.2009 | [2011/21] | WO2009US50600 | Priority number, date | US20080080680P | 14.07.2008 Original published format: US 80680 P | [2011/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010009170 | Date: | 21.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2324455 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/00, G06F15/16, G06Q30/00 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q30/06 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2011/21] | G06Q50/00, G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/21] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON ERGÄNZUNGSINHALTSPOSTEN FÜR SUCHKRITERIEN ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN ANDERER INTERESSIERENDER INHALTSPOSTEN | [2011/21] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR USING SUPPLEMENTAL CONTENT ITEMS FOR SEARCH CRITERIA FOR IDENTIFYING OTHER CONTENT ITEMS OF INTEREST | [2011/21] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UTILISER DES ÉLÉMENTS DE CONTENUS SUPPLÉMENTAIRES POUR DES CRITÈRES DE RECHERCHE DESTINÉS À IDENTIFIER D'AUTRES ÉLÉMENTS DE CONTENUS INTÉRESSANTS | [2011/21] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 10.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.10.2015 | 28.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/06] | 02.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.10.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006253491 (GOKTURK SALIH B [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2008091572 (KRAFT REINER [US], et al); | [Y]JP2003216866 (SATO TOICHIRO); | [A]KR20070077908 (SUNG HEE CHAN [KR]); | [A]JP2004220074 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) | by applicant | US2006253491 | US2008091572 | JP2003216866 | KR20070077908 | JP2004220074 |