EP2304632 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MANAGING LARGE OIL FIELD OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A., Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAHAM, Troy, Darcy Box 1020B RR1 Sylvan Lake, AB T4S 1X6 / CA | 02 /
OLSON, Andrew, Kent 9108 Blossom Time Avenue Bakersfield, CA 93311 / US | 03 /
WALKER, Justin, Lewis 11505 Marazion Hill Court Bakersfield, CA 93311 / US | 04 /
ORAN, Kenan 9408 Meadow Leaf Court Bakersfield, CA 93311 / US | [2011/14] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/14] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09798785.3 | 17.07.2009 | [2011/14] | WO2009US50933 | Priority number, date | US20080175993 | 18.07.2008 Original published format: US 175993 | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010009366 | Date: | 21.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2304632 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, G06F15/16, G06F9/44 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/063116 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06312 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06314 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06315 (EP,US);
G06Q10/1097 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG VON OPERATIONEN AUF GROSSEN ÖLFELDERN | [2011/14] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MANAGING LARGE OIL FIELD OPERATIONS | [2011/14] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR GÉRER DE GRANDES OPÉRATIONS SUR CHAMP DE PÉTROLE | [2011/14] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 01.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/12] | 11.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.04.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 01.10.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 01.10.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.10.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US6282452 (DEGUZMAN NEIL [US], et al); | [A]US2002035551 (SHERWIN RODNEY D [US], et al); | [A]US2007050225 (LESLIE CHRISTOPHER E [US]); | [A]US2007245300 (CHAN BENJAMIN [US], et al); | [A]WO2008061200 (CHEVRON USA INC [US], et al) |