EP2387535 - CONTAINER TREATMENT MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KHS GmbH Juchostrasse 20 44143 Dortmund / DE | [2016/31] |
Former [2011/47] | For all designated states KHS GmbH Juchostrasse 20 44143 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRÄMER, Klaus Dinnendahlweg 1 44267 Dortmund / DE | 02 /
KRESS, Oliver Insternburgerweg 1 45731 Waltrop / DE | 03 /
STIENEN, Thomas Habichtstrasse 19 59425 Unna / DE | [2011/47] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/47] | Application number, filing date | 09799528.6 | 15.12.2009 | [2016/31] | WO2009EP08955 | Priority number, date | DE20091005181 | 15.01.2009 Original published format: DE102009005181 | [2011/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010081516 | Date: | 22.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2387535 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2387535 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65C9/04, B65C9/06 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
B65C9/04 (EP,US);
B65C9/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTERBEHANDLUNGSMASCHINE | [2011/47] | English: | CONTAINER TREATMENT MACHINE | [2011/47] | French: | MACHINE DE TRAITEMENT DE CONTENANTS | [2011/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 16.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2009 | CY | 03.08.2016 | CZ | 03.08.2016 | DK | 03.08.2016 | EE | 03.08.2016 | ES | 03.08.2016 | FI | 03.08.2016 | HR | 03.08.2016 | LT | 03.08.2016 | LV | 03.08.2016 | MC | 03.08.2016 | MK | 03.08.2016 | MT | 03.08.2016 | NL | 03.08.2016 | PL | 03.08.2016 | RO | 03.08.2016 | SE | 03.08.2016 | SI | 03.08.2016 | SK | 03.08.2016 | SM | 03.08.2016 | TR | 03.08.2016 | BG | 03.11.2016 | NO | 03.11.2016 | GR | 04.11.2016 | IS | 03.12.2016 | PT | 05.12.2016 | AT | 15.12.2016 | IE | 15.12.2016 | LU | 15.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 15.12.2009 | |
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
TR | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
AT | 15.12.2016 | ||
IE | 15.12.2016 | ||
LU | 15.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 15.12.2009 | |
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
AT | 15.12.2016 | ||
IE | 15.12.2016 | ||
LU | 15.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
AT | 15.12.2016 | ||
IE | 15.12.2016 | ||
LU | 15.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 15.12.2016 | ||
LU | 15.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 03.08.2016 | |
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 03.08.2016 | |
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 03.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1200197 (ENZINGER UNION WERKE AG) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,10 * column 4, line 5 - line 28 * * column 5, line 18 - line 22; figures 1-5 *; | [A]FR2376030 (SICK INT OTTO [FR]) [A] 1* page 1; figure . *; | [X]US4315795 (JODREY ROBERT M, et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10 * column 4, line 42 - line 53; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0635452 (ROBINO & GALANDRINO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [E]EP2161201 (KRONES AG [DE]) [E] 1,2,5-8 * paragraphs [0026] - [0031] - [0040] - [0042]; figures 1,2 * | Examination | EP0950606 |