EP2373929 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING FIRED HEATER OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | [2011/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARRELL, John, T. 4 Highland Avenue High Bridge, NJ 08829 / US | 02 /
CHHOTRAY, San 6448 Muster Court Centreville, VA 20121 / US | 03 /
DOBBS, Gary, T. 3249 Arrowhead Circle Apt. B Fairfax, VA 22030 / US | 04 /
ALVAREZ, Manuel, S. 6316 York Court Warrenton, VA 20187 / US | 05 /
SCHWEITZER, Patrick, D. 6239 Beverlys Mill Road Broad Run, VA 20137 / US | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe LLC IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Mareschal, Anne, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Shared Services Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | ||
Former [2011/41] | Mareschal, Anne, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Shared Services Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 09799763.9 | 15.12.2009 | WO2009US06562 | Priority number, date | US20080193662P | 15.12.2008 Original published format: US 193662 P | [2011/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010077307 | Date: | 08.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2373929 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/08, F23N5/16, F23N5/18 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
F23N5/08 (EP,US);
F23N5/16 (EP,US);
F23N5/18 (EP,US);
F23L2900/07003 (EP,US);
F23N2229/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES BETRIEBS EINES BEFEUERTEN HEIZERS | [2011/41] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING FIRED HEATER OPERATIONS | [2011/41] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR CONTRÔLER LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE À COMBUSTION | [2011/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/44] | 08.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2006046218 (JOKLIK RICHARD G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-12,14,15,17,18,20-27,31-38,40,41,43,44 * paragraphs [0008] , [0011] , [0013] , [0016] , [0019] , [0021] , [0022] , [0031] , [0032] , [0037] , [0042] , [0043] , [0046] * [Y] 3,4,13,16,28-30,39,42,46 [I] 19,45; | [Y]DE102004028473 (LAMTEC LEIPZIG GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 3,4,28-30 * paragraph [0016] *; | [Y]US2002056276 (DALLA BETTA RALPH A [US], et al) [Y] 13,39 * paragraph [0023] *; | [Y]US2003101725 (MARIN OVIDIU [US], et al) [Y] 16,42 * paragraphs [0058] , [0059] *; | [YA]WO0196722 (CHENG POWER SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 46 * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 1 * * page 11, line 10 - page 12, line 7 * * page 2, line 2 - line 22 * [A] 1,26; | [X]EP1998114 (CHENG POWER SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,11-13,17,18,20-23,26,38,39,43,44,46,47 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0000] , [0008] , [0012] , [0013] , [0017] , [0026] , [0027] , [0029] , [0030] , [0041] , [0045]; claims 1,15-17 *; | [X]US4505668 (DIBIANO ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1,26 * column 1, line 52 - line 58; figure 1 * * column 3, line 35 - line 46 *; | [X]WO2008116037 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [X] 1,26 * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 4 * * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 10 * * page 13, line 13 - line 31 * * page 16, line 26 - page 17, line 2 *; | [A]US7104784 (HASEGAWA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,26 * column 3, line 41 - line 60 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 22 * * column 19, line 32 - line 50 * | Examination | US2006015298 | US5077550 | by applicant | US7019306 | US7334413 | US6127932 | US4709155 | US3689773 | - AIAA JOURNAL, (200702), vol. 45, no. 2, pages 390 - 398 | - ZHOU ET AL., "Development of a Fast Temperature Sensor for Combustion Gases Using a Single Tunable Diode Laser", APPLIED PHYSICS B (LASERS AND OPTICS), (2005), vol. 81, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1007/s00340-005-1934-y, pages 711 - 722, XP019337526 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00340-005-1934-y |