EP2373917 - COVERING ARRANGEMENT FOR A PIPE, AND PIPE HAVING SUCH A COVERING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosen Swiss AG Obere Spichermatt 14 6370 Stans / CH | [2011/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSEN, Hermann St.- Nicklausenstrasse 81 6047 Kastanienbaum (Horw LO) / CH | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Großhandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Grosshandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 09801932.6 | 08.12.2009 | WO2009EP08759 | Priority number, date | DE20081063066 | 23.12.2008 Original published format: DE102008063066 | DE20091017973 | 21.04.2009 Original published format: DE102009017973 | [2011/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010072325 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2373917 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2373917 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F17D5/06, F17D5/00, F16L55/128, F16L55/11 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
F17D5/00 (EP,US);
F17D5/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/41] | F16L55/11, F16L55/128 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Title | German: | ABDECKVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN ROHR UND ROHR MIT EINER SOLCHEN ABDECKVORRICHTUNG | [2011/41] | English: | COVERING ARRANGEMENT FOR A PIPE, AND PIPE HAVING SUCH A COVERING ARRANGEMENT | [2011/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUVERTURE POUR TUBE ET TUBE COMPORTANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF DE COUVERTURE | [2011/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 26.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.09.2012 | CZ | 19.09.2012 | DK | 19.09.2012 | EE | 19.09.2012 | HR | 19.09.2012 | LT | 19.09.2012 | LV | 19.09.2012 | MK | 19.09.2012 | MT | 19.09.2012 | SE | 19.09.2012 | SK | 19.09.2012 | SM | 19.09.2012 | IE | 08.12.2012 | LU | 08.12.2012 | NO | 19.12.2012 | BE | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | IS | 19.01.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
SM | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 08.12.2012 | ||
LU | 08.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 08.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CZ | 19.09.2012 | |
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 08.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CZ | 19.09.2012 | |
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 08.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CZ | 19.09.2012 | |
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CZ | 19.09.2012 | |
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CZ | 19.09.2012 | |
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CZ | 19.09.2012 | |
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CZ | 19.09.2012 | |
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | HR | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | HR | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | HR | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 19.09.2012 | |
NO | 19.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3744528 (VESTAL G) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 3-10; | [Y]US4095810 (KULLE LEE K) [Y] 3-9 * column 3, line 9 - line 15 *; | [Y]DE3526301 (THYSSEN PLASTIK ANGER KG [DE]) [Y] 4-9 * column 2, line 18 - line 65 *; | [A]EP1229173 (KORTMANN KARL [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 8 - column 20 *; | [A]US2004200525 (GOODSON H DEAN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0041] *; | [A]WO2006102259 (SHELL OIL CO [US], et al) [A] 20* page 2, line 20 - page 6, line 20 *; | [A]US7298279 (BADON DOUG [US], et al) [A] 10-21 * column 2, line 30 - column 5, line 59 *; | [Y]US2008092977 (ZEYFANG FREDERICK W [US]) [Y] 3-10 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0027] * |