EP2330420 - DIAGNOSIS METHOD AND DIAGNOSIS KIT FOR CLINICAL AMYOPATHIC DERMATOMYOSITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/23] | DIAGNOSIS METHOD AND DIAGNOSIS KIT FOR DERMATOMYOSITIS | ||
[2014/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keio University 15-45 Mita 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8345 / JP | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUWANA, Masataka c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Shinji c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | 03 /
FUJITA, Takashi c/o Institute for Virus Research Kyoto University 53 Shogoin-kawaharacho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8507 / JP | [2017/36] |
Former [2011/23] | 01 /
KUWANA, Masataka c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | ||
02 /
SATO, Shinji c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | |||
03 /
FUJITA, Takashi c/o Institute for Virus Research Kyoto University 53 Shogoin-kawaharacho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8507 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/36] |
Former [2011/23] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09809743.9 | 31.07.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009JP63633 | Priority number, date | JP20080223789 | 01.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008223789 | [2011/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010024089 | Date: | 04.03.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2330420 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2330420 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/564, G01N33/68, G01N33/53 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
G01N33/5743 (EP,US);
G01N33/6854 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/32] | G01N33/53, G01N33/68, G01N33/574 | ||
Former IPC [2011/36] | G01N33/53, G01N33/68 | ||
Former IPC [2011/23] | G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] |
Former [2011/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIAGNOSEVERFAHREN UND DIAGNOSEKIT FÜR KLINISCHE AMYOPATHISCHE DERMATOMYOSITIS | [2014/04] | English: | DIAGNOSIS METHOD AND DIAGNOSIS KIT FOR CLINICAL AMYOPATHIC DERMATOMYOSITIS | [2014/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC ET KIT DE DIAGNOSTIC POUR LA DERMATOMYOSITE AMYOPATHIQUE CLINIQUE | [2014/04] |
Former [2011/23] | DIAGNOSEVERFAHREN UND DIAGNOSEKIT FÜR DERMATOMYOSITIS | ||
Former [2011/23] | DIAGNOSIS METHOD AND DIAGNOSIS KIT FOR DERMATOMYOSITIS | ||
Former [2011/23] | PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC ET KIT DE DIAGNOSTIC POUR LA DERMATOMYOSITE | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2011 | Translation filed | 24.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 22.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2014 | Observations by third parties | 18.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2009 | AT | 06.09.2017 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | ES | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | HR | 06.09.2017 | IT | 06.09.2017 | LT | 06.09.2017 | LV | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | MK | 06.09.2017 | NL | 06.09.2017 | PL | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | SE | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | SM | 06.09.2017 | TR | 06.09.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | NO | 06.12.2017 | GR | 07.12.2017 | IS | 06.01.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 31.07.2009 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 06.09.2017 | |
NO | 06.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6160107 (TARGOFF IRA N [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 6, line 36 - line 46; figures 1-4; claims 1-8 *; | [T] - SHINJI SATO ET AL, "RNA helicase encoded by melanoma differentiation-associated gene 5 is a major autoantigen in patients with clinically amyopathic dermatomyositis: Association with rapidly progressive interstitial lung disease", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (20090701), vol. 60, no. 7, doi:10.1002/art.24621, ISSN 0004-3591, pages 2193 - 2200, XP055003397 [T] 1-10 * page 2199, column 1, paragraph 4 - page 2199, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.24621 | International search | [A] - SATO S ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (200505), vol. 52, no. 5, pages 1571 - 1576, XP055003396 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.21023 | [A] - MICHITO HIRAKATA, JAPANESE JOURNAL OF CHINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 30, no. 6, pages 444 - 454, XP008144413 | [A] - SHINJI SATO, MOLECULAR RHEUMATOLOGY, (2006), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 3 - 8, XP008144818 | [A] - YAMASAKI Y ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (200702), vol. 56, no. 2, pages 596 - 604, XP008144817 | [A] - VILLERS A ET AL., ANN DERMATOL VENEREOL., (200607), vol. 133, no. 6-7, pages 573 - 576, XP008144394 | Examination | WO2005016962 | - YOSHIRO HORAI ET AL, "Early diagnosis and treatment for remission of clinically amyopathic dermatomyositis complicated by rapid progress interstitial lung disease: a report of two cases", MODERN RHEUMATOLOGY ; OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE JAPAN COLLEGE OF RHEUMATOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, TO, Spinger Inc Tokyo, (20120330), vol. 23, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S10165-012-0637-6, ISSN 1439-7609, pages 190 - 194, XP035162400 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10165-012-0637-6 | - M. J. FRITZLER ET AL, "Molecular characterization of two human autoantigens: unique cDNAs encoding 95- and 160-kD proteins of a putative family in the Golgi complex", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, Rockefeller University Press, New York NY USA, (19930701), vol. 178, no. 1, doi:10.1084/jem.178.1.49, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 49 - 62, XP055176177 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.178.1.49 | - H. KATO ET AL, "Differential roles of MDA5 and RIG-I helicases in the recognition of RNA viruses", NATURE, Basingstoke UK, (20060409), vol. 441, no. 7089, doi:10.1038/nature04734, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 101 - 105, XP055094652 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature04734 | - S. MOGHADAM-KIA ET AL., "Anti-Melanoma Differentiation-Associated Gene 5 Is Associated With Rapidly Progressive Lung Disease and Poor Survival in US Patients With Amyopathic and Myopathic Dermatomyositis", ARTHRITIS CARE & RESEARCH, Hoboken NJ USA, (20160501), vol. 68, no. 5, pages 689 - 694 | - D-TEK, MDA-5, Mons BE, D-TEK, (20151001), pages 1 - 2, XP055289407 | - MOISES LABRADOR-HORILLO ET AL, "Anti-MDA5 Antibodies in a Large Mediterranean Population of Adults with Dermatomyositis", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY RESEARCH, Cairo, (20140204), vol. 2014, pages 1 - 8, XP055289406 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2014/290797 | other | - FRITZLER M.J.ET AL, "MOLECULAR CHARACTERIZATION OF TWO HUMAN AUTOANTIGENS: UNIQUE CDNAS ENCODING 95- AND 160-KD PROTEINS OF A PUTATIVE FAMILY IN THE GOLGI COMPLEX", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (19930701), vol. 178, no. 1, pages 49 - 62, XP055176177 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.178.1.49 |