EP2335570 - WEARING TOOL FOR MEASURING BIOLOGICAL SIGNAL, AND WEARING-TYPE MOTION ASSISTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Tsukuba 1-1-1, Tennodai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8577 / JP | [2011/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANKAI Yoshiyuki c/o University of Tsukuba 1-1-1 Tennodai Tsukuba-Shi Ibaraki 305-8577 / JP | [2011/25] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09813112.1 | 10.09.2009 | [2011/25] | WO2009JP65825 | Priority number, date | JP20080232091 | 10.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008232091 | [2011/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010029966 | Date: | 18.03.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2335570 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0408, A61B5/0478, A61B5/0492, A61F2/60, A61F2/72 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
A41D13/1281 (EP,US);
A61F2/72 (EP,US);
A61B5/296 (EP,US);
A61B5/6805 (EP,US);
A61B5/6828 (EP,US);
A61H1/0255 (EP,US);
A61H3/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61H3/008 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1215 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1463 (EP,US);
A61H2201/163 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1642 (EP,US);
A61H2201/165 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1676 (EP,US);
A61H2201/168 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5007 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5061 (EP,US);
A61H2230/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/25] | Title | German: | TRAGBARES WERKZEUG ZUR MESSUNG BIOLOGISCHER SIGNALE UND TRAGBARE BEWEGUNGSUNTERSTÜTZUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2011/25] | English: | WEARING TOOL FOR MEASURING BIOLOGICAL SIGNAL, AND WEARING-TYPE MOTION ASSISTING DEVICE | [2011/25] | French: | INSTRUMENT À PORTER PERMETTANT DE MESURER DES SIGNAUX BIOLOGIQUES, ET DISPOSITIF D'AIDE AU MOUVEMENT À PORTER | [2011/26] |
Former [2011/25] | INSTRUMENT À PORTER PERMETTANT DE MESURER DES SIGNAUX BIOLOGIQUES, ET DISPOSITIF D AIDE AU MOUVEMENT À PORTER | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2011 | Translation filed | 18.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 08.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.12.2018 | 11.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/36] | 30.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4729377 (GRANEK HERMAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10 * column 1, lines 20-52 * * column 3, lines 4-33 * * column 4, lines 47-56; figure 10 * [I] 5-7; | [Y]US4777954 (KEUSCH PRESTON [US], et al) [Y] 6,7 * column 13, lines 29-58 * * column 19, lines 45-55 *; | [XY]US2002138125 (AXELGAARD JENS [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9 * paragraphs [0028] , [0032] - [0034]; figure 2 * [Y] 6,7; | [XI]US6970731 (JAYARAMAN SUNDARESAN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9 * column 3, lines 41-55 * * column 5, lines 22-53; claims 12-14 * [I] 6,7; | [X]EP1723941 (SANKAI YOSHIYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-4,8,10* paragraphs [0035] , [0060] - [0068]; figure 2 * | International search | [X]JP2005253650 (YAMAUMI YOSHIYUKI); | [Y]JP2008520328 (TAPUZ MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES (T.M.T. 2004) LTD. 2004); | [Y]JP2005349021 (UNIV GIFU, et al); | [A]JP2004237012 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO, et al); | [A]JP2007525269 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.); | [A]JP2007252473 (METTSU KK) | Examination | US2003069514 | WO2004086968 | by applicant | JP2006204426 | JP2008232091 |