EP2259645 - Cyclic prefix determination in OFDM communications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/49] | MOBILE STATION AND WIRELESS BASE STATION | ||
[2017/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 36th floor, 11-1, Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2017/44] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 36th floor, 11-1, Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABETA, Sadayuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
ISHII, Hiroyuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
KISHIYAMA, Yoshihisa c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2017/44] |
Former [2010/49] | 01 /
ABETA, Sadayuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
02 /
ISHII, Hiroyuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
03 /
KISHIYAMA, Yoshihisa c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/44] |
Former [2010/49] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/49] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 DE-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09816173.0 | 24.09.2009 | [2010/49] | WO2009JP66555 | Priority number, date | JP20080249295 | 26.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008249295 | [2010/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010035758 | Date: | 01.04.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2259645 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2259645 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04J11/00, H04L27/26 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
H04L27/2607 (EP,KR,US);
H04J11/0063 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/2626 (KR);
H04L27/2647 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2010/49] | H04W72/04, H04J11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] |
Former [2010/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bestimmung des Zyklischen Präfixes in OFDM-Kommunikation | [2017/08] | English: | Cyclic prefix determination in OFDM communications | [2017/08] | French: | Détermination de préfixe cyclique dans les communications OFDM | [2017/08] |
Former [2010/49] | MOBILE STATION UND RADIO-BASIS-STATION | ||
Former [2010/49] | MOBILE STATION AND WIRELESS BASE STATION | ||
Former [2010/49] | STATION MOBILE ET STATION DE BASE RADIO | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2010 | Translation filed | 26.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 11.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2009 | AT | 01.11.2017 | CY | 01.11.2017 | CZ | 01.11.2017 | DK | 01.11.2017 | EE | 01.11.2017 | FI | 01.11.2017 | HR | 01.11.2017 | IT | 01.11.2017 | LT | 01.11.2017 | LV | 01.11.2017 | MC | 01.11.2017 | MK | 01.11.2017 | PL | 01.11.2017 | RO | 01.11.2017 | SE | 01.11.2017 | SI | 01.11.2017 | SK | 01.11.2017 | SM | 01.11.2017 | TR | 01.11.2017 | BG | 01.02.2018 | GR | 02.02.2018 | IS | 01.03.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 24.09.2009 | |
AT | 01.11.2017 | ||
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 01.11.2017 | |
LT | 01.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1650920 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5 * figures 14-19, 22, 23 * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraphs [0073] - [0103] *; | [X]US2007002726 (ZANGI KAMBIZ C [US]) [X] 1-5 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0017] - [0029] *; | [X]WO2007123340 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-5 * figures 4-7 * * page 11, line 25 - page 17, line 2 *; | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Physical layer aspects for evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (UTRA) (Release 7)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 25.814, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060901), no. V7.1.0, pages 1 - 132, XP050369161 [X] 1-5 * section 7.1.2.4 * | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA) and Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN); Overall description; Stage 2 (Release 8)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.300, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080901), no. V8.6.0, pages 1 - 137, XP050377581 [X] 1-5 * section 5.2 * | International search | [A]JP2001268064 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JP2004253899 (KDDI CORP); | [A]WO2007148796 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) |