EP2348864 - OXIDIZED THIOPHOSPHOLIPID COMPOUNDS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vascular Biogenics Ltd. 6 Jonathan Netanyahu Street 60376 Or Yehuda / IL | [2011/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREITBART, Eyal 27 HaYitzhar Street 73127 Hashmonaim / IL | 02 /
KOVALEVSKI-ISHAI, Eti 68 Sokolov Street 42255 Netania / IL | 03 /
FEIGE, Erez P.O. Box 170 50295 Hemed / IL | 04 /
MENDEL, Itzhak Tzipora Tov 5, Apartment 8 76349 Rehovot / IL | 05 /
ZINIUK, Zeev 11/5 Gorodisky Street 76231 Rechovot / IL | 06 /
HALPERIN, Gideon 6 HaTomer Street 90836 Har-Adar / IL | [2011/42] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
BREITBART, Eyal 27 HaYitzhar Street 73127 Hashmonaim / IL | ||
02 /
KOVALEVSKI-ISHAI, Eti 68 Sokolov Street 42255 Netania / IL | |||
03 /
FEIGE, Erez P.O. Box 170 50295 Hemed / IL | |||
04 /
MENDEL, Itzhak 20/7 Shpinoza Street 76452 Rechovot / IL | |||
05 /
ZINIUK, Zeev 11/5 Gorodisky Street 76231 Rechovot / IL | |||
06 /
HALPERIN, Gideon 6 HaTomer Street 90836 Har-Adar / IL | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Fickert, Stefan Christopher Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/09] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Poccistrasse 11 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/05] | Speich, Stéphane, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Luxembourg-Howald / LU | ||
Former [2012/47] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2011/31] | Fichter, Robert Arno Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | Application number, filing date | 09818874.1 | 01.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009IL00949 | Priority number, date | US20080103571P | 08.10.2008 Original published format: US 103571 P | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010041242 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2348864 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01N57/00, A61K31/66, C07F9/10 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
C07F9/10 (EP,US);
A61P37/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | A01N57/00, A61K31/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Title | German: | OXIDIERTE THIOPHOSPHOLIPIDVERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2011/31] | English: | OXIDIZED THIOPHOSPHOLIPID COMPOUNDS AND USES THEREOF | [2011/31] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE THIOPHOSPHOLIPIDES OXYDÉS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 16.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/51] | 01.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007099868 (HARATS DROR [IL], et al) [Y] 8-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0366] * * compounds VII (CI-201) *; | [Y] - THERESA ROSARIO-JANSEN ET AL, "Phospholipids Chiral at Phosphorus. 13. Stereochemical Comparison of Phospholipase A2, Lecithin-Cholesterol Acyl Transferase, and Platelet-Activating Factor", PHOSPHORUS AND SULFUR AND THE RELATED ELEMENTS, GORDON AND BREACH - HARWOOD ACADEMIC, CH, (19870101), vol. 30, no. 3-4, ISSN 0308-664X, pages 601 - 604, XP008161110 [Y] 8-15 * abstract * * scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/03086648708079137 | International search | [Y]US2007099868 (HARATS DROR [IL], et al); | [Y]US2007264206 (BOGA RAMESHBABU [US], et al) | by applicant | - Gordon and breach, HARWOOD ACADEMIC, (19870101), vol. 30, pages 601 - 604 |