EP2352219 - WIRELESS POWER FEEDER, POWER TRANSMISSION COIL UNIT, AND WIRELESS POWER FEEDER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2017/01] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAISAKO Hiroshi c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Ken c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 03 /
DOI, Naohito c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 04 /
SAKAI, Youhei c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2017/23] |
Former [2011/35] | 01 /
IWAISAKO Hiroshi c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
SATO, Ken c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
DOI, Naohito c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
04 /
SAKAI, Youhei c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
IWAISAKO Hiroshi c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
SATO, Ken c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION, 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
DOI, Naojito c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION, 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
04 /
SAKAI, Youhei c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION, 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/23] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2011/31] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 09826021.9 | 27.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009JP68421 | Priority number, date | JP20080293666 | 17.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008293666 | JP20080293667 | 17.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008293667 | [2011/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010055771 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2352219 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2352219 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
A61B1/041 (EP,US);
A61B1/00029 (EP,US);
H02J2310/23 (EP);
H02J50/005 (EP,US);
H02J50/12 (EP,US);
H02J50/402 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | H02J17/00, A61B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] |
Former [2011/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE STROMZUFUHR, STROMÜBERTRAGUNGSSPULENEINHEIT UND DRAHTLOSES STROMZUFUHRSYSTEM | [2011/31] | English: | WIRELESS POWER FEEDER, POWER TRANSMISSION COIL UNIT, AND WIRELESS POWER FEEDER SYSTEM | [2011/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN ÉNERGIE SANS FIL, UNITÉ EN BOBINE DE TRANSMISSION D'ÉNERGIE ET SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN ÉNERGIE SANS FIL | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2011 | Translation filed | 06.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 05.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.10.2009 | AT | 07.06.2017 | CY | 07.06.2017 | CZ | 07.06.2017 | DK | 07.06.2017 | EE | 07.06.2017 | ES | 07.06.2017 | FI | 07.06.2017 | HR | 07.06.2017 | IT | 07.06.2017 | LT | 07.06.2017 | LV | 07.06.2017 | MC | 07.06.2017 | MK | 07.06.2017 | NL | 07.06.2017 | PL | 07.06.2017 | PT | 07.06.2017 | RO | 07.06.2017 | SE | 07.06.2017 | SI | 07.06.2017 | SK | 07.06.2017 | SM | 07.06.2017 | TR | 07.06.2017 | BG | 07.09.2017 | NO | 07.09.2017 | GR | 08.09.2017 | IS | 07.10.2017 | GB | 27.10.2017 | IE | 27.10.2017 | LU | 27.10.2017 | MT | 27.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | FR | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 27.10.2009 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
GB | 27.10.2017 | ||
IE | 27.10.2017 | ||
LU | 27.10.2017 | ||
MT | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 27.10.2009 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
GB | 27.10.2017 | ||
IE | 27.10.2017 | ||
LU | 27.10.2017 | ||
MT | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 27.10.2009 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
GB | 27.10.2017 | ||
IE | 27.10.2017 | ||
LU | 27.10.2017 | ||
MT | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.10.2009 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
GB | 27.10.2017 | ||
IE | 27.10.2017 | ||
LU | 27.10.2017 | ||
MT | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
GB | 27.10.2017 | ||
IE | 27.10.2017 | ||
LU | 27.10.2017 | ||
MT | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
GB | 27.10.2017 | ||
LU | 27.10.2017 | ||
MT | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
GB | 27.10.2017 | ||
LU | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
GB | 27.10.2017 | ||
LU | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
GB | 27.10.2017 | ||
LU | 27.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 07.06.2017 | |
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JP2001231186 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD) [Y] 3 * figure 5 *[A] 4,7; | [Y]JP2004159456 (IDEN VIDEOTRONICS KK) [Y] 2,3 * paragraph [0013] *; | [IY]EP1932463 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [I] 1,11 * paragraph [0078]; figures 1,5 * [Y] 2,3 | International search | [X]JP2005287888 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [Y]JP2007195961 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP); | [Y]JP2008178544 (OLYMPUS CORP) |