EP2382744 - WEB BASED ACCESS TO VIDEO ASSOCIATED WITH CALLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockstar Consortium US LP 2201 Lakeside Boulevard Suite 1N-110 Richardson, TX 75082 / US | [2014/24] |
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SYLVAIN, Dany 6 rue de Bandol Gatineau Quebec J8T 6A6 / CA | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Brophy, David Timothy, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Brophy, David Timothy, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2011/44] | Boyce, Conor FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 09834186.0 | 02.12.2009 | WO2009IB07629 | Priority number, date | US20080344010 | 24.12.2008 Original published format: US 344010 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010073074 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2382744 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 14.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/18, H04N7/14, H04L29/06, H04N21/4788 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
H04L12/1827 (EP,US);
H04L12/66 (KR);
H04N7/14 (KR,US);
H04L65/1093 (EP,US);
H04L65/1094 (EP);
H04L65/4015 (EP,US);
H04N21/42203 (EP,US);
H04N21/4223 (EP,US);
H04N21/4788 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/44] | H04L12/66, H04N7/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INTERNETBASIERTER ZUGRIFF AUF MIT RUFEN ZUSAMMENHÄNGENDE VIDEOINHALTE | [2011/44] | English: | WEB BASED ACCESS TO VIDEO ASSOCIATED WITH CALLS | [2011/44] | French: | ACCÈS EN LIGNE À UNE VIDÉO ASSOCIÉ À DES APPELS | [2011/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 17.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO03021914 (DIGEO INC [US]) [I] 1-17 * page 12, line 13 - page 15, line 25; figures 5-7 *; | [I]WO2008033826 (NMS COMM CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-17 * page 2, line 1 - line 20 * * page 3, line 19 - line 31 * * page 8, line 6 - page 7, line 25; figure 1 * * page 10, line 14 - line 24; figure 3 * * page 12, line 1 - line 20 *; | [A]US2008309753 (KARNALKAR ANUP [US], et al) [A] 1-17* paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] * | International search | [A]WO03055193 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]); | [X]WO2004008729 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]); | [X]WO2004057818 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]) |