EP2362469 - LATTICE PLATE FOR LEAD STORAGE BATTERY, POLE PLATE AND LEAD STORAGE BATTERY PROVIDED WITH THIS POLE PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 9-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | [2017/08] |
Former [2011/35] | For all designated states Shin-Kobe Electric Machinery Co., Ltd. 8-1, Akashi-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0044 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAKATABE, Hiroyuki c/o Shin-Kobe Electric Machinery Co., Ltd. 8-1 Akashi-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0044 / JP | 02 /
MITANI, Katsura c/o Shin-Kobe Electric Machinery Co., Ltd. 8-1 Akashi-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0044 / JP | 03 /
SANO, Shinichi c/o Shin-Kobe Electric Machinery Co., Ltd. 8-1 Akashi-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0044 / JP | 04 /
HIROSE, Yoshikazu c/o Shin-Kobe Electric Machinery Co., Ltd. 8-1 Akashi-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0044 / JP | 05 /
SHIMOURA, Ichiro c/o Shin-Kobe Electric Machinery Co., Ltd. 8-1 Akashi-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0044 / JP | [2017/22] |
Former [2011/35] | 01 /
WAKATABE, Hiroyuki c/o Shin-Kobe Electric Machinery Co. Ltd. 8-1 Akashi-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0044 / JP | ||
02 /
MITANI, Katsura c/o Shin-Kobe Electric Machinery Co. Ltd. 8-1 Akashi-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0044 / JP | |||
03 /
SANO, Shinichi c/o Shin-Kobe Electric Machinery Co. Ltd. 8-1 Akashi-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0044 / JP | |||
04 /
HIROSE, Yoshikazu c/o Shin-Kobe Electric Machinery Co. Ltd. 8-1 Akashi-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0044 / JP | |||
05 /
SHIMOURA, Ichiro c/o Shin-Kobe Electric Machinery Co. Ltd. 8-1 Akashi-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0044 / JP | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [2012/10] |
Former [2011/35] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09834399.9 | 21.12.2009 | [2017/22] | WO2009JP07068 | Priority number, date | JP20080325156 | 22.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008325156 | JP20090222402 | 28.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009222402 | [2011/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010073588 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2362469 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2362469 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/06, H01M4/73 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
H01M4/73 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/06 (EP,US);
H01M10/12 (KR);
H01M4/14 (KR);
H01M4/72 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T29/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/35] | H01M4/73 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GITTERPLATTE FÜR EINE BLEIBATTERIE, POLPLATTE UND MIT DIESER POLPLATTE AUSGESTATTETE BLEIBATTERIE | [2011/35] | English: | LATTICE PLATE FOR LEAD STORAGE BATTERY, POLE PLATE AND LEAD STORAGE BATTERY PROVIDED WITH THIS POLE PLATE | [2011/35] | French: | PLAQUE EN TREILLIS POUR BATTERIE D'ACCUMULATEUR AU PLOMB, PLAQUE POLAIRE ET BATTERIE D'ACCUMULATEUR AU PLOMB MUNIE DE CETTE PLAQUE POLAIRE | [2011/35] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2011 | Translation filed | 09.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 17.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2009 | AT | 31.05.2017 | CY | 31.05.2017 | CZ | 31.05.2017 | DK | 31.05.2017 | EE | 31.05.2017 | ES | 31.05.2017 | FI | 31.05.2017 | HR | 31.05.2017 | LT | 31.05.2017 | LV | 31.05.2017 | MC | 31.05.2017 | MK | 31.05.2017 | NL | 31.05.2017 | PL | 31.05.2017 | PT | 31.05.2017 | RO | 31.05.2017 | SE | 31.05.2017 | SI | 31.05.2017 | SK | 31.05.2017 | SM | 31.05.2017 | TR | 31.05.2017 | BG | 31.08.2017 | NO | 31.08.2017 | GR | 01.09.2017 | IS | 30.09.2017 | IE | 21.12.2017 | LU | 21.12.2017 | MT | 21.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | FR | 02.01.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 21.12.2009 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MK | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 21.12.2009 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MK | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.12.2009 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.12.2009 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2625574 (LEONARD FULLER) [A] 1-13 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 26; figures 2,5 *; | [X]US3989539 (GRABB NICHOLAS G) [X] 1,12,13 * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 54; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JPS63160168 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]WO0104978 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US])[A] 1-13; | [A]US6300003 (MISRA SUDHAN S [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 18, line 64 - column 22, line 32; figures 14,21,22 * | International search | [Y]JPH02114451 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH04162358 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY); | [A]JPH07235307 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY); | [Y]JP2001273905 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY) | by applicant | JPH04171666 | JP2001332268 |