|
17.05.2018 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
25.04.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2018 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.01.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2018 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.01.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.10.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
08.05.2012 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2011 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.08.2011 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.07.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2010 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
39 |