EP2408378 - BIOPSY DEVICE HAVING ROTATIONAL CUTTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R. Bard, Inc. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANPURA, Himanshu, M. 4805 West Darrell Road Laveen AZ 85339 / US | 02 /
JENSEN, Angela, K. 1732 S. Shore Circle Mesa AZ 85202 / US | 03 /
GUILLORY, Kenneth, Shane 1941 Ramona Ave Salt Lake City UT 84108-3113 / US | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Edward James Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Tomlinson, Edward James Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09841998.9 | 16.03.2009 | WO2009US37289 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010107424 | Date: | 23.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2408378 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/02, A61B17/34 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
A61B10/0275 (EP,US);
A61B17/32002 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0208 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/04] | Title | German: | BIOPSIEVORRICHTUNG MIT ROTATIONSSCHNEIDEVORRICHTUNG | [2012/04] | English: | BIOPSY DEVICE HAVING ROTATIONAL CUTTING | [2012/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BIOPSIE COMPRENANT UNE COUPE ROTATIVE | [2012/04] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 08.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/43] | 22.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5601583 (DONAHUE JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 1,3,9,13,14 * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 22 * * column 6, line 1 - line 12 * * column 6, line 49 - line 55 * * column 8, line 38 - line 43 * * column 8, line 63 - line 67; figures 1-14 * [Y] 5-8,10,11,15; | [Y]US2003125639 (FISHER JOHN S [US], et al) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2004034280 (PRIVITERA SALVATORE [US], et al) [Y] 5-8,10,11 * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0086] *; | [A]US3996935 (BANKO ANTON) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5602449 (KRAUSE KENNETH W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008024684 (BARD INC C R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5602449 (KRAUSE KENNETH W [US], et al); | [A]US5769086 (RITCHART MARK A [US], et al); | [A]US6432064 (HIBNER JOHN A [US], et al); | [A]US5775333 (BURBANK FRED H [US], et al) |