EP2420326 - METHOD FOR THE DRY BENEFICIATION OF WOLLASTONITE ORES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nosachev, Alexey Alexandrovich Ul. Korablestroitelei 30-419 St. Petersburg 199397 / RU | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SNEZHKO, Valery Mikhailovich Moskovsky pr. 153-34 St. Petersburg 196105 / RU | 02 /
KURYSHKIN, Maxim Viktorovich ul. Chkalova 19-80 Gatchina Leningradskaya obl. 188306 / RU | 03 /
NOSACHEV, Alexey Alexandrovich Korablestroitelej 30-419 199397 St. Petersburg / RU | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 09843413.7 | 27.08.2009 | WO2009RU00446 | Priority number, date | RU20090115727 | 17.04.2009 Original published format: RU 2009115727 | [2012/08] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010120204 | Date: | 21.10.2010 | Language: | RU | [2010/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2420326 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 21.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B07B9/00 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
C22B1/00 (EP);
B03C1/16 (EP);
B07B9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TROCKENAUFBEREITUNG VON WOLLASTONITERZEN | [2012/08] | English: | METHOD FOR THE DRY BENEFICIATION OF WOLLASTONITE ORES | [2012/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ENRICHISSEMENT À SEC DE MINERAI DE WOLLASTONITE | [2012/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2011 | Translation filed | 15.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2011 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 03.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/36] | 20.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.02.2014 | 31.08.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]RU2292963 (TKACH VLADIMIR ROMANOVICH [RU], et al); | [A]RU2142348 (AKTSIONERNOE OBSHCHESTVO ZAKRY, et al); | [A]RU2002513 (EVTEEVA VALENTINA DANILOVNA [RU]); | [A]WO2005014188 (FORDING INC [CA], et al) | by applicant | RU2002513 | RU2142348 | RU2292963 |