EP2437558 - POLICY INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Shanshan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Qing Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
PAMPU, Cornel Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
MARCO, Spini Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09846351.6 | 22.06.2009 | WO2009CN72389 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010148551 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2437558 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04W48/16 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (EP,US);
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04W60/00 (EP,US);
H04W8/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/14] | H04W72/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON RICHTLINIENINFORMATIONEN | [2012/14] | English: | POLICY INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM | [2012/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS DE POLITIQUE | [2012/14] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2011 | Translation filed | 27.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 12.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/33] | 08.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2008133606 (DANG SHUJUN [CN], et al) [X] 1,4-9,11-15 * page 2, paragraphs 27,28,41,42,45 * * page 3, paragraphs 60,64,65,79 * * figures 5,6,7 * [A] 2,3,10; | [XA] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Architecture enhancements for non-3GPP accesses (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.402, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090601), no. V9.1.0, pages 1 - 195, XP050363665 [X] 1-4,7-13,15 * page 41, paragraph 4.8 - page 43 * [A] 5,6,14 | [XA] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; Access to the 3GPP Evolved Packet Core (EPC) via non-3GPP access networks; Stage 3; (Release 8)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 24.302, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090601), no. V8.2.0, pages 1 - 45, XP050365261 [X] 1,2,4,7-9,11-13,15 * page 24, paragraph 6.8 - page 26 * [A] 3,5,6,10,14 | International search | [A]WO2005107166 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [A]US2006094427 (BUCKLEY ADRIAN [US], et al); | [A]CN1802013 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101160835 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101325798 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [A]CN101459524 (ZTE CORP [CN]) |