EP2249325 - Motor vehicle with a control device and a receiver and method for controlling different functions of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GM Global Technology Operations LLC 300 Renaissance Center Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US | [2011/30] |
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states GM Global Technology Operations, Inc. 300 Renaissance Center P.O. Box 300 Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonne, Uwe Mainzer Strasse 6 65830 Kriftel / DE | [2010/45] | Representative(s) | Strauss, Peter Adam Opel AG Gewerblicher Rechtschutz Patentrecht IPC: A0-02 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [2012/20] |
Former [2010/45] | Strauss, Peter Adam Opel GmbH Gewerblicher Rechtschutz Patentrecht IPC: A0-02 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10003117.8 | 24.03.2010 | [2010/45] | Priority number, date | DE20091019075 | 27.04.2009 Original published format: DE102009019075 | [2010/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2249325 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2249325 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
G08G1/161 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug mit einem Steuergerät und einer Empfangseinrichtung sowie Verfahren zur Steuerung verschiedener Funktionen eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [2010/45] | English: | Motor vehicle with a control device and a receiver and method for controlling different functions of a motor vehicle | [2010/45] | French: | Véhicule automobile doté d'un appareil de commande et d'un dispositif de réception ainsi que procédé de commande de différentes fonctions d'un véhicule automobile | [2010/45] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 10.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.01.2012 | 05.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2010 | CY | 16.05.2012 | CZ | 16.05.2012 | DK | 16.05.2012 | EE | 16.05.2012 | FI | 16.05.2012 | HR | 16.05.2012 | IT | 16.05.2012 | LT | 16.05.2012 | LV | 16.05.2012 | MK | 16.05.2012 | MT | 16.05.2012 | NL | 16.05.2012 | PL | 16.05.2012 | RO | 16.05.2012 | SE | 16.05.2012 | SI | 16.05.2012 | SK | 16.05.2012 | SM | 16.05.2012 | TR | 16.05.2012 | BG | 16.08.2012 | NO | 16.08.2012 | GR | 17.08.2012 | ES | 27.08.2012 | IS | 16.09.2012 | PT | 17.09.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MK | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
SM | 16.05.2012 | ||
TR | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
SM | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 16.05.2012 | |
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 16.05.2012 | |
NO | 16.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10126618 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-9,11,12 * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 21; figure 1 *; | [XA]DE102006016807 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1-3 * [A] 3,9; | [XA]WO2008008404 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8 * page 2, line 15 - line 26; figure 1 * * page 3, line 27 - page 5, line 22; figures 3,4 * * page 3, line 5 - line 15 * [A] 3,5,6,9,11,12; | [X]EP1713035 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * column 4, line 30 - column 6, line 26; figure 1 * * column 7, line 48 - line 53 * * column 11, line 3 - line 29; figure 4 * |