|
18.01.2024 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2024 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2024 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2024 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.01.2024 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.01.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.2023 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.2023 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.10.2023 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2023 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2023 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
05.06.2023 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.06.2023 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2023 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2023 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
32 |
|
05.06.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
32 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2022 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.11.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.11.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.05.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2022 |
Description |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2022 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.2022 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.02.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.02.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2021 |
Communication about missing proof of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
36 |
|
12.07.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.07.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2021 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.06.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2021 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
28.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.08.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.08.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
20 |
|
03.07.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
20 |
|
26.06.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.06.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.03.2020 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.12.2019 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2019 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.11.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.10.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2019 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.01.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
34 |
|
29.09.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Opposition |
13 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
29 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.01.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
34 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
25 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
90 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
121 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2012 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2012 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.03.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2010 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2010 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2010 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2010 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.07.2010 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.06.2010 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
37 |