EP2251863 - Optical information recording medium and optical information processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 17.08.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Go SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, NAGAIKE-CHO Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
Yamada, Hirohisa SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, NAGAIKE-CHO Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Masaki SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, NAGAIKE-CHO Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 04 /
Harada, Yasuhiro SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, NAGAIKE-CHO Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 05 /
Tajima, Hideharu SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, NAGAIKE-CHO Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 06 /
Maeda, Shigemi SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, NAGAIKE-CHO Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 07 /
Murakami, Yoshiteru SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, NAGAIKE-CHO Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10006073.0 | 30.05.2008 | [2010/46] | Priority number, date | JP20070147462 | 01.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007147462 | JP20070271698 | 18.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007271698 | [2010/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2251863 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2251863 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/005, G11B7/24 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
G11B7/00736 (EP,US);
G11B20/18 (US);
G11B20/10009 (EP,US);
G11B20/10046 (EP,US);
G11B20/1012 (EP,US);
G11B20/10481 (EP,US);
G11B7/24065 (EP,US);
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B20/1426 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2541 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2579 (EP,US);
G11B7/252 (EP,US);
G11B7/258 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Optisches Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium und optisches Informationsverarbeitungsverfahren | [2010/46] | English: | Optical information recording medium and optical information processing apparatus | [2010/46] | French: | Support d'enregistrement d'informations optiques et appareil de traitement d'informations optiques | [2010/46] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 22.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/38] | 14.08.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.01.2019 | 18.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08764924.0 / EP2175447 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080764924) is 10.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5543978 (PARK HYOUNG-WOON [KR]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US6198587 (HAYASHI HIDEKI [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003198165 (MOURI HIROKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1365402 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1467367 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [I]US2006072434 (SHINTANI TOSHIMICHI [JP], et al) [I] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006176947 (LIM HYUN-WOOK [KR]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [IP]EP1835501 (RICOH KK [JP]) [IP] 1,2* the whole document * | by applicant | JP2001250274 | - "Bit Error Rate Characteristic of Write Once Read Many Super-Resolution Near Field Structure Disk", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (2006), vol. 45, no. 2B, pages 1370 - 1373 | - NIKKEI BP, NEXT GENERATION OPTICAL DISC ANATOMICAL TEXTBOOK PAPERBACK EDITION, (20031007), page 109 |