EP2397409 - Method and system for flexible seat arrangement in airplanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bishop GmbH Aeronautical Engineers Blankeneser Bahnhofstrasse 12 22587 Hamburg / DE | [2013/39] |
Former [2011/51] | For all designated states Bishop GmbH Aeronautical Engineers Blankeneser Bahnhofstrasse 12 22587 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bishop, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Bauerspark 18 22587 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Sodore, Oumarou Winfrid Weg 1c 22529 Hamburg / DE | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2012/27] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/51] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10006353.6 | 18.06.2010 | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2397409 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2397409 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/06 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
B64D11/0696 (EP,US);
B64C1/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur flexiblen Sitzanordnung in Flugzeugen | [2011/51] | English: | Method and system for flexible seat arrangement in airplanes | [2011/51] | French: | Procédé et système pour l'agencement flexible de siège dans les avions | [2011/51] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 08.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.06.2010 | AL | 25.09.2013 | AT | 25.09.2013 | BE | 25.09.2013 | BG | 25.09.2013 | CY | 25.09.2013 | CZ | 25.09.2013 | DK | 25.09.2013 | EE | 25.09.2013 | ES | 25.09.2013 | FI | 25.09.2013 | HR | 25.09.2013 | IT | 25.09.2013 | LT | 25.09.2013 | LV | 25.09.2013 | MC | 25.09.2013 | MK | 25.09.2013 | MT | 25.09.2013 | NL | 25.09.2013 | PL | 25.09.2013 | RO | 25.09.2013 | SE | 25.09.2013 | SI | 25.09.2013 | SK | 25.09.2013 | SM | 25.09.2013 | TR | 25.09.2013 | NO | 25.12.2013 | GR | 26.12.2013 | IS | 25.01.2014 | PT | 27.01.2014 | IE | 18.06.2014 | LU | 18.06.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 18.06.2010 | |
AT | 25.09.2013 | ||
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
BG | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MK | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
SM | 25.09.2013 | ||
TR | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 18.06.2010 | |
AT | 25.09.2013 | ||
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
BG | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
SM | 25.09.2013 | ||
TR | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.06.2010 | |
AT | 25.09.2013 | ||
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
BG | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
SM | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
BG | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
SM | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
SM | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 25.09.2013 | |
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 25.09.2013 | |
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 25.09.2013 | |
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 25.09.2013 | |
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 25.09.2013 | |
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 25.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE102008006947 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] - [0017] - [0020] - [0023] - [0030] - [0050] , [0051] , [0064] - [0072] - [0076] , [0081] - [0086]; figures 1-13 * [A] 2-8,10-12; | [A]EP1480874 (BISHOP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9 * paragraphs [0020] - [0033]; figures 2,6,8 *; | [A]JPH02279433 (TENRYU INDUSTRIES) [A] 1,9 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1480874 | EP2019037 | EP2062815 |