EP2269999 - Method for preparing crystalline s-omeprazole strontium hydrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hanmi Science Co., Ltd. 550 Dongtangiheung-ro Dongtan-myeon Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-813 / KR | [2012/42] |
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states Hanmi Holdings Co., Ltd. No. 45, Bangi-dong Songpa-gu Seoul 138-828 / KR | ||
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Hanmi Pharm. Co., Ltd. 893-5 Hajeo-ri, Paltan-myeon Hwaseong-gun Kyungki-do 445-910 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ha, Tae, Hee Seohai Granble Apt. 413-2101 Solbitmaeul, Bansong-dong Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-758 / KR | 02 /
Oh, Hee, Sook Duri Villa 2-201, No. 583 Gueumho-dong 3-ga Seongdong-gu Seoul 133-805 / KR | 03 /
Kim, Won, Jeoung Iville 101, No. 510-11 Maetang-3-dong Youngtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-803 / KR | 04 /
Park, Chang, Hee Dongho-villa 203, No. 457-2 Sanggal-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-905 / KR | 05 /
Kim, Eun, Young Uman Jugong Apt. 406-1302, No. 300 Uman 1-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-750 / KR | 06 /
Kim, Young, Hoon Worldmerdian Bandoubora Apt. 345-803, nr. 80, Bansong-dong Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-736 / KR | 07 /
Suh, Kwee, Hyun Greenville 101-204, No. 1258 Maetan-3-dong, Youngtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-792 / KR | 08 /
Lee, Gwan, Sun Woochang Apt. 3-404, Okeum-dong Songpa-gu Seoul 138-739 / KR | [2016/09] |
Former [2011/09] | 01 /
Ha, Tae, Hee Seohai Granble Apt. 413-2101 Solbitmaeul, Bansong-dong, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-758 / KR | ||
02 /
Oh, Hee, Sook Duri Villa 2-201, No. 583 Gueumho-dong 3-ga Seongdong-gu Seoul 133-805 / KR | |||
03 /
Kim, Won, Jeoung Iville 101, No. 510-11, Maetang-3-dong Youngtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-803 / KR | |||
04 /
Park, Chang, Hee Dongho-villa 203, No. 457-2 Sanggal-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-905 / KR | |||
05 /
Kim, Eun, Young Uman Jugong Apt. 406-1302, No. 300 Uman 1-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-750 / KR | |||
06 /
Kim, Young, Hoon Worldmerdian Bandoubora Apt. 345-803, nr. 80, Bansong-dong, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-736 / KR | |||
07 /
Suh, Kwee, Hyun Greenville 101-204, No. 1258 Maetan-3-dong, Youngtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-792 / KR | |||
08 /
Lee, Gwan, Sun Woochang Apt. 3-404, Okeum-dong Songpa-gu Seoul 138-739 / KR | |||
Former [2011/01] | 01 /
Ha, Tae, Hee Sinnamusil 512-1504, No. 964-5 Youngtong-dong, Youngtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-727 / KR | ||
02 /
Oh, Hee, Sook Duri Villa 2-201, No. 583 Gueumho-dong 3-ga Seongdong-gu Seoul 133-805 / KR | |||
03 /
Kim, Won, Jeoung Iville 101, No. 510-11, Maetang-3-dong Youngtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-803 / KR | |||
04 /
Park, Chang, Hee Dongho-villa 203, No. 457-2 Sanggal-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-905 / KR | |||
05 /
Kim, Eun, Young Uman Jugong Apt. 406-1302, No. 300 Uman 1-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-750 / KR | |||
06 /
Kim, Young, Hoon Youngdeungpo Prugio Apt., 103-902 Youngdeungpo-dong, Youngdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-030 / KR | |||
07 /
Suh, Kwee, Hyun Greenville 101-204, No. 1258 Maetan-3-dong, Youngtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-792 / KR | |||
08 /
Lee, Gwan, Sun Woochang Apt. 3-404, Okeum-dong Songpa-gu Seoul 138-739 / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/09] |
Former [2011/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10009565.2 | 28.06.2006 | [2011/01] | Priority number, date | KR20050101059 | 26.10.2005 Original published format: KR 20050101059 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2269999 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2269999 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, A61K31/4439, A61P1/04 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/09] |
Former [2011/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von kristallinem S-Omeprazole-Strontiumhydrat | [2011/01] | English: | Method for preparing crystalline s-omeprazole strontium hydrate | [2011/01] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'hydrate cristallin de s-omeprazole de strontium | [2011/01] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 06.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06013379.0 / EP1780207 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060013379) is 14.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2006 | AT | 02.03.2016 | BE | 02.03.2016 | CY | 02.03.2016 | CZ | 02.03.2016 | DK | 02.03.2016 | EE | 02.03.2016 | ES | 02.03.2016 | FI | 02.03.2016 | IT | 02.03.2016 | LT | 02.03.2016 | LV | 02.03.2016 | MC | 02.03.2016 | NL | 02.03.2016 | PL | 02.03.2016 | RO | 02.03.2016 | SE | 02.03.2016 | SI | 02.03.2016 | SK | 02.03.2016 | TR | 02.03.2016 | BG | 02.06.2016 | GR | 03.06.2016 | GB | 28.06.2016 | IE | 28.06.2016 | LU | 28.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | FR | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | IS | 02.07.2016 | PT | 04.07.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 28.06.2006 | |
AT | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
GB | 28.06.2016 | ||
IE | 28.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
GB | 28.06.2016 | ||
IE | 28.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2006120520 (GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [IN], et al) [E] 1-4 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 8 - page 3, paragraph 11 * * page 6, paragraph 27 - page 7, paragraph 29 * * page 8, paragraph 35 * * page 10, paragraph 40 * * example - *; | [AD]US6369085 (COTTON HANNA [SE], et al) [AD] 1-6 * column 1, lines 20-29 * * example 7 * | by applicant | EP0005129 | US4738974 | WO9208716 | US6162816 | US5714504 | US5693818 | US6369085 | US6511996 | WO2004099182 | WO2005011692 | WO03074514 | WO2005023796 | WO2005023797 | KR20050068761 | - ERLANDSSON ET AL., JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1990), vol. 535, pages 305 - 319 | - COTTON ET AL., TETRAHEDRON ASYMMETRY, (2000), vol. 11, pages 3819 - 3825 | - P. J. MARIE ET AL., MINERAL & ELECTROLYTE METABOLISM, (1985), vol. 11, pages 5 - 13 | - S.P. NIELSEN, BONE, (2004), vol. 35, pages 583 - 588 |