EP2271093 - Advertisements detection in an end-user controlled playback environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NDS Limited One London Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 4EX / GB | [2011/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wachtfogel, Reuven c/o NDS Technologies Israel Ltd. P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 02 /
Maissel, Jonathan c/o NDS Technologies Israel Ltd. P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 03 /
Kranc, Moshe c/o NDS Technologies Israel Ltd. P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 04 /
Richardson, David c/o NDS Technologies Israel Ltd. P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 05 /
Tsuria, Yossi c/o NDS Technologies Israel Ltd. P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 06 /
Michelson, Sam c/o NDS Technologies Israel Ltd. P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 07 /
Krause, Mika c/o NDS Technologies Israel Ltd. P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 08 /
Epstein, Steve c/o NDS Technologies Israel Ltd. P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 09 /
Schlissel, Moshe c/o NDS Technologies Israel Ltd. P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 10 /
Handelman, Doron c/o NDS Technologies Israel Ltd. P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 11 /
Kipnis, Shlomo c/o NDS Technologies Israel Ltd. P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 12 /
Shen-Orr, Chaim c/o NDS Technologies Israel Ltd. P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 13 /
Katz, Ron c/o NDS Technologies Israel Ltd. P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | White, Duncan Rohan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10010000.7 | 14.01.2001 | [2011/01] | Priority number, date | US20000176215P | 14.01.2000 Original published format: US 176215 P | US20000179968P | 03.02.2000 Original published format: US 179968 P | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2271093 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16, H04N5/00, H04N7/167 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
H04N21/23424 (EP,US);
H04N21/25435 (EP,US);
H04N21/2547 (EP,US);
H04N21/25883 (EP,US);
H04N21/4181 (EP,US);
H04N21/4331 (EP,US);
H04N21/4333 (EP,US);
H04N21/4353 (EP,US);
H04N21/44016 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/454 (EP,US);
H04N21/458 (EP,US);
H04N21/47815 (EP,US);
H04N21/6543 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | Detektion von Werbung in einer durch Endverbraucher gesteuerten Wiedergabeumbegung | [2011/01] | English: | Advertisements detection in an end-user controlled playback environment | [2011/01] | French: | Détection de publicité dans un environnement de lecture contrôlé par un utilisateur final | [2011/01] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 05.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/27] | 15.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/27] | 17.02.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01900610.5 / EP1169858 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010900610) is 26.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0680214 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XY]WO9966719 (WEBTV NETWORKS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,7-15 * page 5, line 16 - page 7, line 11 * * page 8, line 10 - page 8, line 15 * * page 10, line 9 - page 10, line 16 * * page 11, line 18 - page 11, line 19 * * page 13, line 7 - page 13, line 30 * * page 15, line 19 - page 26, line 11; figures 5,7 * [Y] 4-6; | [A]EP0967804 (SARNOFF CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y] - "HANDBOOK OF APPLIED CRYPTOGRAPHY, PASSAGE ED - MENEZES A; OORSCHOT VAN P; VANSTONE S", HANDBOOK OF APPLIED CRYPTOGRAPHY; [CRC PRESS SERIES ON DISCRETE MATHEMATICES AND ITS APPLICATIONS], CRC PRESS, BOCA RATON, FL, US, (19970101), ISBN 978-0-8493-8523-0, XP000864287 [Y] 4-6 * pages 16,170 * * pages 506,507 * | Examination | WO0002380 | by applicant | US5414773 | US5715315 | WO9901984 | WO0001149 | IL20010121230 | US20000179968 | US20000515118 |