EP2275248 - Non-expanded porous polytetrafluoroethylene (PTFE) products and methods of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited Clarendon House 2 Church Street Hamilton HM11 / BM | [2014/48] |
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited P.O. Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings Christ Church / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Girton, Timothy, Samuel 5512 Ridge Park Road Edina, MN 55436 / US | 02 /
Sogard, David, John 5809 Concord Avenue Edina, MN / US | [2011/03] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/03] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10011348.9 | 01.11.2001 | [2011/03] | Priority number, date | US20000704494 | 02.11.2000 Original published format: US 704494 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2275248 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/20, A61F2/06, A61L31/14, A61F2/91, A61F2/915, A61L31/04 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2/915 (EP,US);
A61L31/048 (EP,US);
A61L31/146 (EP,US);
B29C67/202 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91541 (EP,US);
A61F2220/005 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0058 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0066 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0075 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L31/048, C08L27/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/03] | B29C67/20, A61F2/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2011/03] | Title | German: | Nichtexpandierte poröse Gegenstände aus Polytetrafluoräthylen (PTFE) und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [2011/03] | English: | Non-expanded porous polytetrafluoroethylene (PTFE) products and methods of manufacture | [2011/03] | French: | Produits en polytétrafluoroéthylène (PTFE) poreux non expansé et procédé de fabrication | [2011/03] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 21.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 11.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01992638.5 / EP1385691 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010992638) is 28.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8702996 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,5-9* pages 11-17 *; | [A]WO9826731 (ATRIUM MEDICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-4,10,11 * claims 1,38 *; | [I]WO9857680 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [I] 1-4 * page 8, paragraph 2; claim 1 * * page 4, paragraph 4 * | Examination | WO9600103 | by applicant | US4576608 | US4849285 | US5141522 | WO9600103 | US5716660 | US5824046 | US5840775 | US6010529 | US6022902 |