EP2295700 - Door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Opposition rejected | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hörmann KG Brockhagen Horststrasse 17 33803 Steinhagen / DE | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hörmann, Thomas J. Am Schlaufenglan 33 66606 St. Wendel / DE | 02 /
Brinkmann, Michael, Dr. Pestalozzistraße 19 33790 Halle / DE | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Seranski, Klaus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstraße 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | Seranski, Klaus Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/11] | Seranski, Klaus Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10012416.3 | 03.02.2005 | [2011/11] | Priority number, date | DE20041014182 | 23.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004014182 | [2011/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2295700 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2295700 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2295700 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/24, E06B9/17, E06B7/23 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
E06B7/2316 (EP,US);
E05D15/24 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/71 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/106 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/11] | E06B7/23 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | Tor | [2011/11] | English: | Door | [2011/11] | French: | Porte | [2011/11] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 14.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.04.2014 | Observations by third parties | 14.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05002295.3 / EP1580393 | EP09007167.1 / EP2103771 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050002295) is 26.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.09.2015
15.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Alpha Deuren International BV Eekhegstraat 3 6942 GB Didam / NL Opponent's representative Puschmann Borchert Kaiser Klettner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bajuwarenring 21 82041 Oberhaching / DE | 02
10.09.2015
15.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Novoferm GmbH Schüttensteiner Strasse 26 46419 Isselburg / DE Opponent's representative Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.09.2015
15.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Alpha Deuren International BV Eekhegstraat 3 6942 GB Didam / NL Opponent's representative Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bajuwarenring 21 82041 Oberhaching / DE | ||
02
10.09.2015
15.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Novoferm GmbH Schüttensteiner Strasse 26 46419 Isselburg / DE Opponent's representative Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte GbR An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | |||
Former [2015/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Alpha Deuren International BV Eekhegstraat 3 6942 GB Didam / NL Opponent's representative Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bajuwarenring 21 82041 Oberhaching / DE | 15.10.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.02.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.08.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.10.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.10.2017 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 28.10.2020 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2021/01] | Appeal following opposition | 21.12.2017 | Appeal received No. T2799/17 | 09.02.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.10.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 28.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 10.12.2014 | CY | 10.12.2014 | EE | 10.12.2014 | FI | 10.12.2014 | MC | 10.12.2014 | RO | 10.12.2014 | SI | 10.12.2014 | SK | 10.12.2014 | AT | 03.02.2015 | IE | 03.02.2015 | LU | 03.02.2015 | BE | 28.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | GR | 11.03.2015 | IS | 10.04.2015 | PT | 10.04.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/25] | EE | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
AT | 03.02.2015 | ||
IE | 03.02.2015 | ||
LU | 03.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | EE | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
IE | 03.02.2015 | ||
LU | 03.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | EE | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
IE | 03.02.2015 | ||
LU | 03.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | EE | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
LU | 03.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | EE | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
LU | 03.02.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | EE | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
LU | 03.02.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | EE | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | EE | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | EE | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 10.12.2014 | |
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 10.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE1659585 (BUSCH JAEGER DUERENER METALL) [Y] 4,5,8-12 * page 5, paragraph 2; figures 1, 7-11 * * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 1 * [A] 1,6; | [A]US3896590 (MILLER NORMAN K) [A] 1-4,7,8,11 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 38 * * column 4, line 37 - line 55; figures 1,2,8 *; | [YD]EP0370376 (HOERMANN KG [DE]) [YD] 13 * figure 10 *; | [Y]DE4410051 (WIRTH ERWIN [DE]) [Y] 3,7 * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 5; figures 1-5 * * column 11, line 44 - column 12, line 35 *; | [A]US5446937 (HASKINS CRAIG A [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 1, line 10 - column 2, line 8 *; | [Y]US5673740 (PARK KAP-IL [KR]) [Y] 1-46 * column 5, lines 1-62; figures 3,5,6,9A,9B,10; claim 1 *; | [A]US6061967 (JUDDS RAYMOND E [US]) [A] 1,2,5-7 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]JP2000197713 (SANWA SHUTTER CORP) [A] 1-46 * figures 5a,5b *; | [Y]US6176039 (CRAIG TERRY A [US]) [Y] 37,38 * column 4, lines 36-58; figures 1,3,4 *; | [Y]US2002046494 (MILLER BEARGE D [US], et al) [Y] 27-36,39-46 * column 1, lines 47-53; figures 1-3d *; | [A]US2003005644 (REITHMEYER JOSEPH GUY [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6,7* figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1375798 (BREMET BREVETTI METECNO S P A [IT]) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0007] , [0012] - [0014] - [0024] , [0031] - [0036]; figures 3-7 *; | [Y] - "Türen und Türzubehör, DIN 18024 Teil 2 vom November 1996", DIN-Taschenbuch 240, Beuth Verlag GmbH, (20030831), vol. 3, pages 44 - 47, XP055038108 [Y] 1,6,14-26 * 7. Untere Türanschläge und -schwellen; page 47 * | Examination | US2003111187 | by applicant | EP0304642 | EP0370376 | WO0155543 | other | US2017012 | DE1608585U | US6006814 | WO0155543 | Opposition | EP1375798 | - "Sektionaltore, Das grosse Programm fur Neubau und Renovierung - Innovationen, Ideen, Losungen - Sektionator Typ ISO 45", SIEBAU Brochure, XP055262843 |