EP2290916 - Configurable adaptive global traffic control and management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Level 3 CDN International, Inc. 1025 Eldorado Blvd. Broomfield CO 80021 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Level 3 CDN International, Inc. 1025 Eldorado Blvd. Broomfield CO 80021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Middleton, Ted 4086 Bending Oak Ct. Moorpark, CA 93021 / US | 02 /
Stolorz, Paul E. 776 Calle Mandarinas Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | 03 /
Salmon, John K. 240 Taos Rd. Altadena, CA 91001 / US | 04 /
Warren, Michael S. 240 Taos Rd. Altadena, CA 91001 / US | 05 /
Koller, Jeffrey 3549 Glen Abbey Lane Oxnard, CA 93036 / US | 06 /
Hagberg, Aric 36 Camino Chupadero Santa Fe, New Mexico 87506 / US | 07 /
Yevmenkin, Maksim 427 Sundance Street Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | 08 /
Brady, Mark 115 West Avenida de Los Arboles Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | 09 /
Pfitzner, David 951 Warwick Avenue, Apt. D-1 Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | [2015/24] |
Former [2011/18] | 01 /
Middleton, Ted 4086 Bending Oak. Moorpark, CA 93021 / US | ||
02 /
Stolorz, Paul E. 776 Calle Mandarinas Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | |||
03 /
Salmon, John K. 240 Taos Rd. Altadena, CA 91001 / US | |||
04 /
Warren, Michael S. 240 Taos Rd. Altadena, CA 91001 / US | |||
05 /
Koller, Jeffrey 60 Camino de los Montoyas Santa Fe, NM 87501 / US | |||
06 /
Hagberg, Aric 36 Camino Chupadero Santa Fe, New Mexico 87506 / US | |||
07 /
Yevmenkin, Maksim 427 Sundance Street Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | |||
08 /
Brady, Mark 115 West Avenida de Los Arboles Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | |||
09 /
Pfitzner, David 951 Warwick Avenue, Apt. D-1 Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | |||
Former [2011/09] | 01 /
Middleton, Ted 4086 Bending Oak. Moorpark, CA 93021 / US | ||
02 /
Stolorz, Paul E. 776 Calle Mandarinas Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | |||
03 /
Salmon, John K. 240 Taos Rd. Altadena, CA 91001 / US | |||
04 /
Warren, Michael S. 240 Taos Rd. Altadena, CA 91001 / US | |||
05 /
Koller, Jeffrey 60 Camino de los Montoyas Santa Fe, NM 87501 / US | |||
06 /
Hagberg, Aric 22330 Meyler St. Apt. 1 Torrance, CA 90502 / US | |||
07 /
Yevmenkin, Maksim 427 Sundance Street Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | |||
08 /
Brady, Mark 115 West Avenida de Los Arboles Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | |||
09 /
Pfitzner, David 951 Warwick Avenue, Apt. D-1 Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | Representative(s) | Martin, Philip John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/51] | Gwilt, Julia Louise, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB2 1LA / GB | ||
Former [2012/02] | Gwilt, Julia Louise, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | ||
Former [2011/13] | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/09] | Altenburg, Udo Bardehle Pagenberg Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10012965.9 | 30.09.2002 | [2011/09] | Priority number, date | US20010325177P | 28.09.2001 Original published format: US 325177 P | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2290916 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2290916 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2290916 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L29/12, H04L12/24, H04L29/06, // H04L12/26 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
H04L67/1034 (EP,KR,US);
H04L41/0894 (EP,KR);
H04L41/0631 (US);
H04L41/069 (US);
H04L41/0893 (US);
H04L41/22 (EP,KR,US);
H04L43/00 (EP,US);
H04L43/04 (US);
H04L43/045 (EP,KR,US);
H04L43/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04L43/0811 (EP,KR,US);
H04L43/0817 (EP,KR,US);
H04L43/0852 (EP,KR,US);
H04L43/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04L43/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04L61/35 (EP,KR,US);
H04L61/4511 (EP,KR,US);
H04L67/1001 (EP,US);
H04L67/1008 (EP,KR,US);
H04L67/1021 (EP,KR,US);
H04L67/1023 (EP,KR,US);
H04L67/1029 (EP,KR,US);
H04L67/1031 (EP,KR,US);
H04L67/1036 (US);
H04L67/52 (EP,KR,US);
H04L67/55 (US);
H04L69/329 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04W4/02 (EP,KR);
H04W4/021 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/15] | H04L29/12, H04L12/24 | ||
Former IPC [2011/09] | H04L29/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2015/51] |
Former [2011/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Konfigurierbare adaptive globale Verkehrssteuerung und -verwaltung | [2011/09] | English: | Configurable adaptive global traffic control and management | [2011/09] | French: | Regulation et gestion de trafic global adaptative configurable | [2011/09] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 07.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2015 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 24.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02799672.7 / EP1436736 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020799672) is 08.12.2004 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.12.2015 | BE | 16.12.2015 | BG | 16.12.2015 | CY | 16.12.2015 | CZ | 16.12.2015 | DK | 16.12.2015 | EE | 16.12.2015 | ES | 16.12.2015 | FI | 16.12.2015 | IT | 16.12.2015 | SE | 16.12.2015 | SK | 16.12.2015 | TR | 16.12.2015 | GR | 17.03.2016 | PT | 18.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
TR | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | SE | 16.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0817444 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * figure 3 * * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 21 * * column 5, line 6 - column 7, line 58 *; | [A]WO0026806 (NORTEL NETWORKS CORP [CA], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 1 - page 3 *; | [A]WO0041091 (3COM CORP [US]) [A] 1-18 * page 2, line 17 - page 4, line 14 *; | [A]WO0052594 (ULTRADNS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 4, line 1 - page 7, line 6 ** page 16, line 17 - line 25 *; | [A]WO0078004 (ALCATEL INTERNETWORKING INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * page 1, line 15 * * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 35 *; | [A]GB2354350 (MITEL CORP [CA], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 2, paragraph l - page 3, paragraph 1 * * "Summary of the Invention"; page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 1; figure 3 *; | [I]WO0139003 (SPEEDERA NETWORKS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * page 3, line 6 - page 4, line 2 * * page 5, line 18 - line 24 * * page 7, line 19 - page 11, line 33; figure 1 * * page 15, line 10 - page 17, line 13; figure 5 *; | [A]US6282574 (VOIT ERIC A [US]) [A] 1-18 * column 4, line 40 - line 50 *; | [Y] - STEVENS M L ET AL, "POLICY-BASED MANAGEMENT FOR IP NETWORKS", BELL LABS TECHNICAL JOURNAL, WILEY, CA, US, (19991001), vol. 4, no. 4, doi:10.1002/BLTJ.2192, ISSN 1089-7089, pages 75 - 94, XP000902472 [Y] 1-18 * Passage starting at "Policy-Based Network Management" to "Directories and LDAP"; page 3, column l - page 4, column l * * page 9, column r, paragraph l * * Pragraphs "Industry Direction", "Pushing Configuration Data", "Pulling Configuration Data", "Implementing Configuration in the Pull Model"; page 11 - page 12; figures 3,4,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bltj.2192 | [A] - DURHAM D ET AL, "The COPS (Common Open Policy Service) Protocol; rfc2748.txt", 20000101, (20000101), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015008531 [A] 1-18 * Complete Chapter "1. Introduction"; page 3 - page 6 * |