|
10.12.2019 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2019 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2019 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
09.07.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2019 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.01.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
10.10.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.10.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.10.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.10.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.10.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
43 |
|
19.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.04.2018 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2016 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.05.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
01.07.2013 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2013 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.03.2013 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.02.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2011 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
15.03.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
87 |