EP2442052 - Regulating method carried out in a heating assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immosolar Active Building Technologies, S.L. Grand Via Puig des Castellet 1-Blq 1-2 07180 Santa Ponsa (Calvia) Islas Baleares / ES | [2012/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vogel, Holger Son Vich 1 07160 Peguera Mallorca / ES | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | Sasse, Stefan White & Case LLP Valentinskamp 70 / EMPORIO 20355 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Sasse, Stefan White & Case LLP Jungfernstieg 51 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10013546.6 | 12.10.2010 | [2012/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2442052 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F25B30/02, G05D23/19 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
G05D23/19 (EP);
F24D19/1012 (EP,US);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur regelung, welches in einer Heizungsanlage ausgeführt wird | [2012/16] | English: | Regulating method carried out in a heating assembly | [2012/16] | French: | Procédé de réglage développé dans une installation de chauffage | [2012/16] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/21] | 05.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0730213 (BAUNACH HANS GEORG [DE]) [Y] 2,5-8 * column 23, line 47 - column 24, line 9 * * claim 9 ** figures 4,11 *; | [IY]EP1018627 (DUTCH HEATPUMP B V [NL]) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0004] , [0020] , [0021] * * claim 15 * [Y] 2,5-8 | by applicant | DE4124304 |